WHITE v. AMAZON.COM INC et al

Plaintiff: HILLARY WHITE
Defendant: DOES 1-10 and AMAZON.COM INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00255
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for AMAZON.COM INC - Per Order #15: Answer due by 8/12/2019. (mnw)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting without objection #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by AMAZON.COM INC Responses due by 8/16/2019. (STITHAM, STACY)
July 9, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Attorney CAESAR D KALINOWSKI shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 7/16/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMAZON.COM INC. (STITHAM, STACY)
July 1, 2019 Set Deadlines: Attorneys JOHN A. GOLDMARK and CAESAR D KALINOWSKI shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 7/8/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (slg)
July 1, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for AMAZON.COM INC per Order #12: Answer due by 7/29/2019. (slg)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to July 29, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by AMAZON.COM INC Responses due by 7/19/2019. (STITHAM, STACY)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caesar Kalinowski filed by STACY O. STITHAM on behalf of AMAZON.COM INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2041792.) (STITHAM, STACY)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John A. Goldmark filed by STACY O. STITHAM on behalf of AMAZON.COM INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2041785.) (STITHAM, STACY)
June 27, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from AMAZON.COM INC by 7/5/2019. (mnw)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY O. STITHAM on behalf of AMAZON.COM INC (STITHAM, STACY)
June 19, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for Amazon.com Inc per summons returned executed #6: Answer due by 6/28/2019. (clp)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #5 Summons Returned Executed : Docket Entry modified by the Clerk's office to add filed in error notation. The summons returned executed has been re-filed as ECF #6. (clp)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HILLARY WHITE. AMAZON.COM INC served on 6/7/2019. (DANCHUK, EMILY)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR**SUMMONS Returned Executed by HILLARY WHITE. AMAZON.COM INC served on 6/11/2019. (DANCHUK, EMILY) Modified on 6/19/2019 to add filed in error notation(clp).
June 11, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2033103.), filed by HILLARY WHITE.(DANCHUK, EMILY)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; copy e-mailed to U.S Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Rider) (akr)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AMAZON.COM INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (akr)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (akr)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMAZON.COM INC, DOES 1-10 with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by HILLARY WHITE. (Service of Process Deadline 9/3/2019) Fee due by 6/7/2019.(akr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE v. AMAZON.COM INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM INC
Represented By: CAESAR D. KALINOWSKI
Represented By: STACY O. STITHAM
Represented By: JOHN A. GOLDMARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILLARY WHITE
Represented By: EMILY A. DANCHUK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?