WILKEY v. MOWI ASA et al

Plaintiff: ROBIN WILKEY
Defendant: OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, BREMNES SEASHORE AS, SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD, MOWI ASA, SALMAR ASA, LEROY SEAFOOD GROUP ASA, GRIEG SEAFOOD ASA, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC, OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC, OCEAN QUALITY AS and DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00268
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by ROBIN WILKEY (O'MEARA, RICHARD)
June 12, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2033725.), filed by ROBIN WILKEY.(O'MEARA, RICHARD)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BREMNES SEASHORE AS, DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, GRIEG SEAFOOD ASA, GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD, LEROY SEAFOOD GROUP ASA, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, MOWI ASA, OCEAN QUALITY AS, OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC, SALMAR ASA, SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Marine Harvest USA, LLC summons, #2 Marine Harvest Canada, Inc summons, #3 Ducktrap River of Maine LLC summons, #4 Grieg Seafood ASA summons, #5 Grieg Seafood BC Ltd summons, #6 Bremnes Seashore AS summons, #7 Ocean Quality AS summons, #8 Ocean Quality North America Inc summons, #9 Ocean Quality USA Inc, #10 Ocean Quality Premium Brands, Inc summons, #11 SalMar ASA summons, #12 Leroy Seafood Group ASA summons, #13 Leroy Seafood USA Inc summons, #14 Scottish Sea Farms Ltd summons)(bfa)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BREMNES SEASHORE AS, DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC, GRIEG SEAFOOD ASA, GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD, LEROY SEAFOOD GROUP ASA, LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC, MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC, MARINE HARVEST USA LLC, MOWI ASA, OCEAN QUALITY AS, OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC, OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC, OCEAN QUALITY USA INC, SALMAR ASA, SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ROBIN WILKEY. (Service of Process Deadline 9/9/2019) Fee due by 6/13/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILKEY v. MOWI ASA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BREMNES SEASHORE AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOWI ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALMAR ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEROY SEAFOOD GROUP ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRIEG SEAFOOD ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINE HARVEST USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN QUALITY USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN QUALITY AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN WILKEY
Represented By: RICHARD L. O'MEARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?