FLANDERS v. ATHENAHEALTH INC
Plaintiff: ADAM FLANDERS
Defendant: ATHENAHEALTH INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00283
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion to Seal Documents By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
June 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by ADAM FLANDERS (No PDF Attached. See PDF Attachment 7-1) (jwr)
June 30, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ATHENAHEALTH INC waiver sent on 6/24/2019.Answer due by 8/23/2019. (lrc)
June 30, 2019 Filing 7 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal Documents by ADAM FLANDERS (Attachments: #1 Safe at Home Letter)(lrc)
June 25, 2019 Filing Fee Received from ADAM FLANDERS: Amount Paid: $400.00. Receipt Number: 119000236. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 6/25/2019. (mtm)
June 21, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Filing Fee due by 7/12/2019. (MFS)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re Attachment 2 to #1 Complaint, filed by ADAM FLANDERS. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. Please also refer to the Information Handout for Pro Se Filers. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (mlm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ADAM FLANDERS (mlm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by ADAM FLANDERS (mlm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mlm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ATHENAHEALTH INC, filed by ADAM FLANDERS. (Service of Process Deadline 9/18/2019) (Attachments: #1 *sealed per Order #10* Confirmation for form Intake, #2 *sealed per Order #10* EEOC Document, #3 *sealed per Order #10* EEOC Right to Sue)(mlm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #4 Complaint for Employment Discrimination) (mlm). Modified on 7/3/2019 to indicate exhibits are sealed (jwr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLANDERS v. ATHENAHEALTH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATHENAHEALTH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM FLANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?