WHITNEY et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: REBECCA WHITNEY and DUSTIN WHITNEY
Defendant: ALEX AZAR, DAVID BERNHARDT, KIRK FRANCIS, PENOBSCOT NATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, CAROLYN ADAMS, ESQ, DARYL LACOUNTE, TARA SWEENY, MICHAEL AUGUSTINE, BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00299
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by DUSTIN WHITNEY (WILLEY, EZRA)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #10 Stipulation of Dismissal : This entry has been marked "Filed in Error." A Notice of Dismissal is to be filed. (akr)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR*** STIPULATION of Dismissal by DUSTIN WHITNEY. (WILLEY, EZRA) Modified on 8/23/2019 (akr).
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to KIRK FRANCIS, CAROLYN ADAMS, ESQ, MICHAEL AUGUSTINE, ALEX AZAR, DAVID BERNHARDT, BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, DARYL LACOUNTE, PENOBSCOT NATION, TARA SWEENY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Michael Augustine, #2 Summons as to Penobscot Nation Tribal Court, #3 Summons as to Tara Sweeny, #4 Summons as to United States Department of the Interior, #5 Summons as to USA, #6 Summons as to United States DHHS, #7 Summons as to Alex Azar, #8 Summons as to Bureau of Indian Affairs, #9 Summons as to Carolyn Adams, #10 Summons as to Daryl Lacounte, #11 Summons as to David Bernhardt)(tcs)
June 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Document sealed from public view) SEALED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DENIAL OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
June 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Seal By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal by DUSTIN WHITNEY Responses due by 7/19/2019. (WILLEY, EZRA)
June 28, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2041417.), filed by REBECCA WHITNEY, DUSTIN WHITNEY.(WILLEY, EZRA)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAROLYN ADAMS, ESQ, MICHAEL AUGUSTINE, ALEX AZAR, DAVID BERNHARDT, BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KIRK FRANCIS, DARYL LACOUNTE, PENOBSCOT NATION, TARA SWEENY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by REBECCA WHITNEY, DUSTIN WHITNEY. (Service of Process Deadline 9/25/2019) Fee due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - amended complaint filed in USDC, Northern Texas, #2 Exhibit B - Order in USDC, Northern Texas)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITNEY et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRK FRANCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENOBSCOT NATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLYN ADAMS, ESQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARYL LACOUNTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARA SWEENY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL AUGUSTINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA WHITNEY
Represented By: EZRA A.R. WILLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUSTIN WHITNEY
Represented By: EZRA A.R. WILLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?