QUINT v. CTME LLC
Plaintiff: JANET R QUINT
Defendant: CTME LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00314
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/19/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 12/26/2019. Motions due by 1/9/2020. Ready for Trial on 3/3/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by CTME LLC.(FORD, BENJAMIN)
July 17, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for CTME LLC : Answer due by 8/1/2019. (sfw)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANET R QUINT. CTME LLC served on 7/11/2019. (PROSS, JAMES)
July 3, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2044044.), filed by JANET R QUINT.(PROSS, JAMES)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CTME LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (sfw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CTME LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JANET R QUINT. (Service of Process Deadline 10/1/2019) Fee due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Record of Conversation 6/17/2016, #2 Exhibit B: Record of Conversation (witnessed), #3 Exhibit C: Request for Separation/Wage Information)(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QUINT v. CTME LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET R QUINT
Represented By: JAMES F. PROSS, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTME LLC
Represented By: BENJAMIN E. FORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?