GLADU v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS A GLADU
Defendant: GLADYS CASSESE, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and TROY ROSS
Not Yet Classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00315
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Paul Andrews filed by NICHOLAS A GLADU. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(lrc)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #11 Motion to Add Material Evidence to the Record; denying without prejudice #12 Motion to Add Material Medical Records. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Add Material Medical Records by NICHOLAS A GLADU (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Patient Profile, #2 Exhibit B- Maine Nephrology Associates Printout, #3 Exhibit C- Maine Nephrology Associates Summary of Visit, #4 Exhibit D- Maine Nephrology Associates Printout, #5 Exhibit E- Maine Nephrology Associates Progress Note, #6 Envelope)(lrc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Add Material Evidence to the Record by NICHOLAS A GLADU (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope)(lrc)
August 9, 2019 SET Answer Deadline for MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, GLADYS CASSESE, and TROY ROSS pursuant to acceptance of service ECF No. 10: Answer due by 9/20/2019. (nrg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 AGREEMENT of Acceptance of Service by GLADYS CASSESE, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, TROY ROSS (BOLTON, JONATHAN)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE: The Court has completed its preliminary review and ordered the complaint to be served. Pursuant to the Agreement on Service between the Clerk of Court and the Maine Attorney General, this Notice constitutes service as directed by the Court. The Maine Attorney General shall file notice of acceptance or declination of acceptance of service within 30 days. (Deadline to File Acceptance or Declination of Acceptance of Service is 8/21/2019) (lrc)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to Prison from Clerk's Office regarding Collection of Fees. (lrc)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying 6 Motion for Reduction in Partial Filing Fee. The initial fee is modest and the fee will be collected as funds are available. Any objections to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Reduction of Partial Filing Fee. No PDF document is attached. To view the request, see ECF No. 5. by NICHOLAS A GLADU (lrc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 INDICATION by Prisoner NICHOLAS A GLADU of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lrc)
July 8, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 7/29/2019. (MFS)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Declaration (construed by Court as Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis). Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 7/29/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE re Trust Account Statement attached to #2 Declaration filed by NICHOLAS A GLADU. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (jwr)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Nicholas Gladu filed by NICHOLAS A GLADU in support of Request for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Business Office Certificate, #2 Trust Account Statement)(jwr)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLADYS CASSESE, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, TROY ROSS with Jury Demand, filed by NICHOLAS A GLADU. (Service of Process Deadline 10/3/2019) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLADU v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLADYS CASSESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROY ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS A GLADU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?