OLIVAS v. CONWAY TECHNOLOGY GROUP LLC
Plaintiff: MANUEL OLIVAS
Defendant: CONWAY TECHNOLOGY GROUP LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00316
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CONWAY TECHNOLOGY GROUP LLC. (SILVER, STEVEN)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CONWAY TECHNOLOGY GROUP LLC.(SILVER, STEVEN)
July 19, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for CONWAY TECHNOLOGY GROUP, LLC Per Waiver of Service of Summons executed 7/15/19: Answer due by 9/6/2019. (clp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed MANUEL OLIVAS waiver sent on 7/8/2019. (CHURCHILL, SARAH)
July 8, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2044928.), filed by MANUEL OLIVAS.(CHURCHILL, SARAH)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CONWAY TECHNOLOGY GROUP LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONWAY TECHNOLOGY GROUP LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MANUEL OLIVAS. (Service of Process Deadline 10/7/2019) Fee due by 7/10/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLIVAS v. CONWAY TECHNOLOGY GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL OLIVAS
Represented By: SARAH A. CHURCHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONWAY TECHNOLOGY GROUP LLC
Represented By: STEVEN J. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?