CHASSE v. OPM OFFICE OF PERSONAL MANAGEMENT
Plaintiff: TEODORA I CHASSE
Defendant: OPM OFFICE OF PERSONAL MANAGEMENT
Case Number: 1:2019cv00328
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to OPM OFFICE OF PERSONAL MANAGEMENT. (jwr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re #1 Complaint Attachments 1, 2 and 5, filed by TEODORA I CHASSE. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. Please also refer to the Information Handout for Pro Se Filers. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (jwr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER to pro se of first filing to TEODORA I CHASSE. (jwr)
July 15, 2019 Filing Fee Received from TEODORA I CHASSE: Amount Paid: $400.00. Receipt Number: 119000252. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 7/15/2019 (jwr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by TEODORA I CHASSE (jwr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by TEODORA I CHASSE against OPM OFFICE OF PERSONAL MANAGEMENT with Jury Demand. (Service of Process Deadline 10/15/2019) (Attachments: #1 FERS Application for Immediate Retirement, #2 6/7/19 Letter, #3 5/30/19 Letter, #4 4/29/19 BlueCross BlueShield letter, #5 Certificate of Death, #6 Envelope)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHASSE v. OPM OFFICE OF PERSONAL MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPM OFFICE OF PERSONAL MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEODORA I CHASSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?