HAYWARD v. TD BANK NA
Plaintiff: BRETT HAYWARD
Defendant: TD BANK NA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00330
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for TD BANK NA per Order No. 8 entered this date: Answer due by 9/20/2019. (lrc)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting without objection #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by September 20, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by TD BANK NA Responses due by 9/27/2019. (HOLBROOK, ANDREA)
August 5, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for TD BANK NA pursuant to the Order entered this date: Answer due by 9/6/2019. (lrc)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting without objection #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The parties' request for an extension of time for the defendant to answer is properly styled as a motion, not a "stipulation." So construed, and although no reason in support of the motion has been given, the defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by September 6, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, for extension of time for defendant TD Bank N.A. to respond to Complaint by TD BANK NA. (HOLBROOK, ANDREA) Modified on 8/5/2019 to change to motion to extend time to file answer (lrc).
July 17, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TD BANK NA per Summons Returned Executed filed on 7/17/2019: Answer due by 8/7/2019. (lrc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRETT HAYWARD. TD BANK NA served on 7/17/2019. (RUGGIERO, DANIEL)
July 16, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2048934.), filed by BRETT HAYWARD.(RUGGIERO, DANIEL)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TD BANK NA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TD BANK NA with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BRETT HAYWARD. (Service of Process Deadline 10/15/2019) Fee due by 7/17/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAYWARD v. TD BANK NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD BANK NA
Represented By: ANDREA T. HOLBROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT HAYWARD
Represented By: DANIEL G. RUGGIERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?