DAY v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: DAWN M DAY
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00350
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 PROCEDURAL ORDER: Statement of Errors/Fact Sheet due by 10/28/2019. Ready for SS Oral Argument the week of 3/9/2020. By DEPUTY CLERK: Charity Pelletier. (clp)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Social Security Appeal) by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript Index, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Non Disability Related Development, #6 Disability Related Development, #7 Medical Records Part 1, #8 Medical Records Part 2)(CARTER, MOLLY)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER.(CARTER, MOLLY)
August 9, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER per Affadavit of Service ECF #7: Answer due by 9/30/2019. (clp)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by DAWN M DAY. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER served on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return receipts)(DUFOUR, JAMES)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MOLLY E. CARTER on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (CARTER, MOLLY)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 ATTORNEY GENERAL summons, #2 U.S. ATTORNEY summons)(bfa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAWN M DAY (bfa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by DAWN M DAY. (Service of Process Deadline 10/28/2019)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAY v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN M DAY
Represented By: JAMES A. DUFOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Represented By: MOLLY E. CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?