FLETCHER v. WALMART INC
Plaintiff: ERIN B FLETCHER
Defendant: WALMART INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00352
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/19/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 12/26/2019. Motions due by 1/9/2020. Ready for Trial on 3/3/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by WALMART INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALMART INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by WALMART INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
July 31, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2056973.), filed by WALMART INC.(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
July 31, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/7/2019 for WALMART INC. (sfw)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 8/7/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Susan Way. (sfw)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings Summons, Complaint, Answer, Notice of Removal from KENNEBEC COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number KENSC-CV-2019-160. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WALMART INC. (Service of Process Deadline 10/29/2019) Fee due by 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed in KENSC-CV-2019-160, #2 Summons filed in KENSC-CV-2019-160, #3 Answer filed in KENSC-CV-2019-160, #4 Notice of Removal from Superior Court)(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLETCHER v. WALMART INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC
Represented By: DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN B FLETCHER
Represented By: HARRY B. CENTER, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?