RICHARDSON-KELLEY v. KENNEBEC LUMBER COMPANY
Plaintiff: TERESA RICHARDSON-KELLEY
Defendant: KENNEBEC LUMBER COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00367
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting without objection #8 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The parties may take up to 7 depositions per side, without prejudice to further, future amendment on sufficient showing. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by TERESA RICHARDSON-KELLEY Responses due by 10/21/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/27/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/3/2020. Motions due by 2/18/2020. Ready for Trial on 4/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (slg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties by KENNEBEC LUMBER COMPANY (RIDEOUT, LAURA)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by KENNEBEC LUMBER COMPANY.(RIDEOUT, LAURA)
August 21, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for KENNEBEC LUMBER COMPANY : Answer due by 9/6/2019. (akr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TERESA RICHARDSON-KELLEY. KENNEBEC LUMBER COMPANY served on 8/16/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
August 13, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2062328.), filed by TERESA RICHARDSON-KELLEY.(HANSEN, CHAD)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KENNEBEC LUMBER COMPANY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KENNEBEC LUMBER COMPANY with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TERESA RICHARDSON-KELLEY. (Service of Process Deadline 11/12/2019) Fee due by 8/15/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHARDSON-KELLEY v. KENNEBEC LUMBER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNEBEC LUMBER COMPANY
Represented By: LAURA A. RIDEOUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA RICHARDSON-KELLEY
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?