PENA v. MARSHALL COMMUNICATIONS INC
Plaintiff: ALBERT PENA
Defendant: MARSHALL COMMUNICATIONS INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00380
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline Regarding Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for MARSHALL COMMUNICATIONS INC : Answer due by 11/14/2019. (jwr)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by MARSHALL COMMUNICATIONS INC Responses due by 10/31/2019. (KATZ, ROGER)
September 30, 2019 Reset Deadlines Regarding Order on Motion to Extend Time : Entry of Local Counsel and Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 10/15/2019. (jwr)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to file Pro Hac Vice Motion and to seek Local Counsel. This will be the final enlargement of time with respect to filing a pro hac vice motion and to secure local counsel. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Time to file Pro Hac Vice Motion and to seek Local Counsel by ALBERT PENA Responses due by 10/21/2019. (LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD)
September 16, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline Regarding Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for MARSHALL COMMUNICATIONS INC : Answer due by 10/15/2019. (jwr)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting without objection #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by MARSHALL COMMUNICATIONS INC Responses due by 10/4/2019. (SMITH, STEPHEN)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN C. SMITH on behalf of MARSHALL COMMUNICATIONS INC (SMITH, STEPHEN)
August 29, 2019 Reset Deadlines Regarding Order on Motion to Extend Time : Entry of Appearance by local counsel and Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 9/30/2019 from Attorney RICHARD P. LIEBOWITZ. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jwr)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to File Pro Hac Vice and to Engage Local Counsel. Time is extended to September 30, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time File Pro Hac Vice and Engage Local Counsel by ALBERT PENA Responses due by 9/18/2019. (LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD)
August 23, 2019 Set Deadlines : Entry of Appearance of Local Counsel and Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 8/30/2019 from Attorney Liebowitz. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jwr)
August 20, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2066031.), filed by ALBERT PENA.(LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; copy e-mailed to U.S Copyright Office. (jgd)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MARSHALL COMMUNICATIONS INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (jgd)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jgd)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARSHALL COMMUNICATIONS INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ALBERT PENA. (Service of Process Deadline 11/14/2019) Fee due by 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Bass Harbor Head Lighthouse Photograph, #2 Exhibit B-Certificate of Registration, #3 Exhibit C-Article)(jgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENA v. MARSHALL COMMUNICATIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSHALL COMMUNICATIONS INC
Represented By: ROGER J. KATZ
Represented By: STEPHEN C. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT PENA
Represented By: RICHARD P. LIEBOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?