COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC et al v. MILLS et al
Plaintiff: CBS CORP, DISCOVERY INC, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP, A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, C-SPAN, DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, VIACOM INC and NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC
Defendant: TOWN OF BOWDOIN MAINE, TOWN OF WOOLWICH MAINE, TOWN OF BOWDOINHAM MAINE, TOWN OF HARPSWELL MAINE, TOWN OF TOPSHAM MAINE, TOWN OF BERWICK MAINE, TOWN OF KITTERY MAINE, TOWN OF BRUNSWICK MAINE, JANET MILLS, TOWN OF PHIPPSBURG MAINE, TOWN OF FREEPORT MAINE, TOWN OF WEST BATH MAINE, AARON FREY, TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE, TOWN OF DURHAM MAINE, TOWN OF SOUTH BERWICK MAINE and CITY OF BATH MAINE
Petitioner: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BROADCASTERS, MAINE ASSOCIATION OF BROADCASTERS and MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00410
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Supplemental Authority by AARON FREY, JANET MILLS (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
November 1, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Motion Hearing held on November 1, 2019 before Judge Nancy Torresen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tammy Martell, Telephone Number: 207.272.5566. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2020. (MARTELL, TAMMY)
November 1, 2019 Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Motion Hearing held re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (mnw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, C-SPAN, CBS CORP, DISCOVERY INC, DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP & VIACOM INCA&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, C-SPAN, CBS CORP, DISCOVERY INC, DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP & VIACOM INC. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA) Modified on 10/16/2019 to add filers A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, C-SPAN, CBS CORP, DISCOVERY INC, DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP & VIACOM INC (mnw).
October 10, 2019 Filing 84 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Town Defendants Without Prejudice by A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, C-SPAN, CBS CORP, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, DISCOVERY INC, DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP, VIACOM INC. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA) Modified on 10/10/2019 to clean up text (mnw).
October 8, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #67 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #71 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #74 MOTION to Dismiss, #75 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and #80 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Jurisdiction : Responses due by 10/15/2019. Replies due by 10/22/2019. (mnw)
October 8, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Reply due by 10/15/2019. (mnw)
October 8, 2019 Set Deadlines : No answer or responsive pleading filed by defendant CITY OF BATH MAINE - Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 11/7/2019. (mnw)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 Motion for leave to file a 10 page reply brief. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (bcs)
October 8, 2019 Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION for Additional Pages for Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, C-SPAN, CBS CORP, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, DISCOVERY INC, DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP, VIACOM INC Responses due by 10/29/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
October 7, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TOWN OF BERWICK MAINE, TOWN OF BOWDOINHAM MAINE, TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE, TOWN OF FREEPORT MAINE, TOWN OF SOUTH BERWICK MAINE, TOWN OF TOPSHAM MAINE. Reply due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dana Lee, #2 Exhibit A to Lee Declaration, #3 Declaration of Perry Ellsworth, #4 Exhibit A to Ellsworth Declaration, #5 Declaration of Peter Joseph, #6 Exhibit A to Joseph Declaration, #7 Declaration of Richard Roedner, #8 Exhibit A to Roedner Declaration, #9 Declaration of Stephen Eldridge, #10 Exhibit A to Eldridge Declaration, #11 Declaration of Thomas Woodin, #12 Exhibit A to Woodin Declaration)(ALBERT, EBEN) Modified on 10/8/2019 to clean up duplicate exhibit text (mnw).
October 7, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Jurisdiction by TOWN OF BERWICK MAINE, TOWN OF BOWDOINHAM MAINE, TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE, TOWN OF FREEPORT MAINE, TOWN OF SOUTH BERWICK MAINE, TOWN OF TOPSHAM MAINE Responses due by 10/28/2019. (ALBERT, EBEN)
October 7, 2019 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TOWN OF HARPSWELL MAINE. Reply due by 10/21/2019. (PIAMPIANO, JEFFREY)
October 7, 2019 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TOWN OF DURHAM MAINE. Reply due by 10/21/2019. (CONWAY, JOHN)
October 7, 2019 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TOWN OF BOWDOIN MAINE. Reply due by 10/21/2019. (CONWAY, JOHN)
October 7, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TOWN OF DURHAM MAINE Responses due by 10/28/2019. (CONWAY, JOHN)
October 7, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TOWN OF BOWDOIN MAINE Responses due by 10/28/2019. (CONWAY, JOHN)
October 7, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss by TOWN OF BRUNSWICK MAINE, TOWN OF WOOLWICH MAINE Responses due by 10/28/2019. (COLLINS, KRISTIN)
October 7, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TOWN OF HARPSWELL MAINE Responses due by 10/28/2019. (PIAMPIANO, JEFFREY)
October 7, 2019 Filing 72 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TOWN OF KITTERY MAINE, TOWN OF WEST BATH MAINE. Reply due by 10/21/2019. (DAGGETT, SALLY)
October 7, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TOWN OF PHIPPSBURG MAINE Responses due by 10/28/2019. (MAHER, JESSICA)
October 7, 2019 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TOWN OF PHIPPSBURG MAINE. Reply due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amber Jones)(MAHER, JESSICA)
October 7, 2019 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AARON FREY, JANET MILLS. Reply due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A (Testimony of Rep. Evangelos), #2 Exhibit - B (FCC Press Release and Fact Sheet), #3 Exhibit - C (Testimony of Office of the Public Advocate), #4 Exhibit - D (Letter from Office of the Public Advocate), #5 Exhibit - E (Letter from FCC official), #6 Exhibit - F (List of Networks on On Demand Service), #7 Exhibit - G (List of ABC Programs on On Demand System), #8 Exhibit - H (List Duck Dynasty Seasons on On Demand System), #9 Exhibit - I (Testimony of Charter Communications Representative))(TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
October 7, 2019 Filing 68 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 Amicus MOTION for Leave to File a Brief as Amici Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs, #54 MOTION for Leave to File AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE, INC. ET AL.S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by AARON FREY, JANET MILLS. Reply due by 10/21/2019. (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
October 4, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TOWN OF KITTERY MAINE, TOWN OF WEST BATH MAINE Responses due by 10/25/2019. (DAGGETT, SALLY)
October 4, 2019 Filing 66 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by TOWN OF DURHAM MAINE.(CONWAY, JOHN)
October 4, 2019 Filing 65 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by TOWN OF BOWDOIN MAINE.(CONWAY, JOHN)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - Pursuant to Rule 65(a)(2), the trial on the merits of the Plaintiffs' claims for declaratory and injunctive relief shall be consolidated with the November 1, 2019 hearing on the Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Leave to File. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (bcs)
October 2, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File 25-Page Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motion by AARON FREY, JANET MILLS Responses due by 10/23/2019. (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
September 24, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN E. F. LANGSDORF on behalf of TOWN OF BRUNSWICK MAINE (LANGSDORF, STEPHEN)
September 23, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA L. MAHER on behalf of TOWN OF PHIPPSBURG MAINE (MAHER, JESSICA)
September 20, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Telephone Conference held on September 19, 2019 before Judge Nancy Torresen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tammy Martell, Telephone Number: 207-272-5566. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2019. (MARTELL, TAMMY)
September 20, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP R. SAUCIER on behalf of TOWN OF BERWICK MAINE, TOWN OF BOWDOINHAM MAINE, TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE, TOWN OF FREEPORT MAINE, TOWN OF SOUTH BERWICK MAINE, TOWN OF TOPSHAM MAINE (SAUCIER, PHILIP)
September 20, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorneys ERIN LORRAINE DOZIER, KRISTIN M. COLLINS, RICHARD ADAM KAPLAN & STEPHEN BLAKE KINNAIRD shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/27/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw)
September 20, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF HEARING re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 2 before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
September 19, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #44 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief as Amici Curiae and #54 MOTION for Leave to File AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF : Defendants' Responses due by 10/7/2019. Plaintiffs' Responses due by 10/15/2019. Replies due by 10/22/2019. (mnw)
September 19, 2019 Set Deadlines : Any Motions to Dismiss due by 10/7/2019. Response due by 10/15/2019. Replies due by 10/22/2019. (mnw)
September 19, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Responses due by 10/7/2019. Reply due by 10/15/2019. (mnw)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORAL ORDER denying for reasons stated on the record #15 Motion to Expedite Briefing and Argument Schedule With Respect to Motion for Preliminary Injunction - By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Telephone Conference held. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (mnw)
September 18, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE, INC. ET AL.S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Motion Picture Association, Inc. Responses due by 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KENNEDY, WILLIAM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 53 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James S. Blackburn filed by WILLIAM KENNEDY on behalf of Motion Picture Association, Inc. (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2080775.) (KENNEDY, WILLIAM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 52 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Oscar Ramallo filed by WILLIAM KENNEDY on behalf of Motion Picture Association, Inc. (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2080774.) (KENNEDY, WILLIAM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 51 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Ulin filed by WILLIAM KENNEDY on behalf of Motion Picture Association, Inc. (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2080772.) (KENNEDY, WILLIAM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by EBEN M. ALBERT on behalf of TOWN OF BERWICK MAINE, TOWN OF BOWDOINHAM MAINE, TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE, TOWN OF FREEPORT MAINE, TOWN OF SOUTH BERWICK MAINE, TOWN OF TOPSHAM MAINE (ALBERT, EBEN)
September 18, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN W. CONWAY on behalf of TOWN OF BOWDOIN MAINE, TOWN OF DURHAM MAINE (CONWAY, JOHN)
September 18, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erin L. Dozier and Richard A. Kaplan filed by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-2080428.) (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Richard A. Kaplan)(WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
September 18, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY K. TCHAO on behalf of TOWN OF HARPSWELL MAINE (TCHAO, AMY)
September 18, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY T. PIAMPIANO on behalf of TOWN OF HARPSWELL MAINE (PIAMPIANO, JEFFREY)
September 17, 2019 Filing 45 PROPOSED AMICUS BRIEF by National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters. (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) Modified on 9/18/2019 to reflect this is a proposed brief until the court rules on ECF no. 44(mjlt).
September 17, 2019 Filing 44 Amicus MOTION for Leave to File a Brief as Amici Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs by National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters Responses due by 10/8/2019. (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
September 17, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen B. Kinnaird filed by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2080139.) (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
September 17, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
September 17, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Certification of Compliance With ECF Nos. 38 and 39 by all Plaintiffs by COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 17, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Certification of Compliance With ECF Nos. 38 and 39 by All Plaintiffs (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 16, 2019 Set Deadlines - Per Order #38: Certification from plaintiffs' counsel due by 5:00 p.m. on 9/17/2019. (mnw)
September 16, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF HEARING : Telephone Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 11:00 AM before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Counsel for the plaintiffs to coordinate the call in accordance with Order #38. (mnw)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - The Clerk's Office is directed to schedule a telephone conference with all the parties for Thursday, September 19, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to contact counsel for all defendants to notify them about the conference and to provide call in information. Counsel for the plaintiff shall provide the court with documentation no later than 5:00 p.m. on September 17, 2019 certifying that they have notified all defendants of the telephone conference. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
September 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for CITY OF BATH MAINE - Per Summons Returned Executed #37: Answer due by 10/4/2019. (mnw)
September 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF BOWDOIN MAINE - Per Summons Returned Executed #36: Answer due by 10/4/2019. (mnw)
September 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF BRUNSWICK MAINE - Per Summons Returned Executed #35: Answer due by 10/4/2019. (mnw)
September 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF WEST BATH MAINE - Per Summons Returned Executed #34: Answer due by 10/4/2019. (mnw)
September 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF DURHAM MAINE - Per Summons Returned Executed #33: Answer due by 10/4/2019. (mnw)
September 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF HARPSWELL MAINE - Per Waiver of Service Executed #32: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (mnw)
September 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF TOPSHAM MAINE - Per Waiver of Service Executed #31: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (mnw)
September 15, 2019 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, CBS CORP, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, DISCOVERY INC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, VIACOM INC, C-SPAN. CITY OF BATH MAINE served on 9/13/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 15, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, CBS CORP, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, DISCOVERY INC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, VIACOM INC, C-SPAN. TOWN OF BOWDOIN MAINE served on 9/13/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 15, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, CBS CORP, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, DISCOVERY INC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, C-SPAN. TOWN OF BRUNSWICK MAINE served on 9/13/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 15, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, CBS CORP, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, DISCOVERY INC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, VIACOM INC, C-SPAN. TOWN OF WEST BATH MAINE served on 9/13/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 15, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, CBS CORP, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, DISCOVERY INC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, VIACOM INC, C-SPAN. TOWN OF DURHAM MAINE served on 9/13/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed TOWN OF HARPSWELL MAINE waiver sent on 9/11/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed TOWN OF TOPSHAM MAINE waiver sent on 9/13/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 13, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF BOWDOINHAM MAINE - Per Waiver of Service Executed #30: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (mnw)
September 13, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF BERWICK MAINE - Per Waiver of Service Executed #29: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (mnw)
September 13, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF SOUTH BERWICK MAINE - Per Waiver of Service Executed #28: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (mnw)
September 13, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF FREEPORT MAINE - Per Waiver of Service Executed #27: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (mnw)
September 13, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE - Per Waiver of Service Executed #26: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (mnw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed TOWN OF BOWDOINHAM MAINE waiver sent on 9/13/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed TOWN OF BERWICK MAINE waiver sent on 9/13/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed TOWN OF SOUTH BERWICK MAINE waiver sent on 9/13/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed TOWN OF FREEPORT MAINE waiver sent on 9/13/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE waiver sent on 9/13/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 13, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF WOOLWICH MAINE - Per Waiver of Service Executed #25: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (mnw)
September 13, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF PHIPPSBURG MAINE - Per Waiver of Service Executed #23: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (mnw)
September 13, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF KITTERY MAINE - Per Waiver of Service Executed #22: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (mnw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed TOWN OF WOOLWICH MAINE waiver sent on 9/10/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to CITY OF BATH MAINE, TOWN OF BERWICK MAINE, TOWN OF BOWDOINHAM MAINE, TOWN OF BRUNSWICK MAINE, TOWN OF DURHAM MAINE, TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE, TOWN OF FREEPORT MAINE, TOWN OF HARPSWELL MAINE, TOWN OF PHIPPSBURG MAINE, TOWN OF SOUTH BERWICK MAINE, TOWN OF TOPSHAM MAINE, TOWN OF WOOLWICH MAINE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Bowdoinham, #2 Summons - Durham, #3 Summons - Phippsburg, #4 Summons - South Berwick, #5 Summons - Topsham, #6 Summons - Berwick, #7 Summons - Eliot, #8 Summons - Freeport, #9 Summons - Harpswell, #10 Summons - Woolwich, #11 Summons - Brunswick)(jwr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed TOWN OF PHIPPSBURG MAINE waiver sent on 9/12/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 12, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. TOWN OF KITTERY MAINE waiver sent on 9/12/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA) Modified on 9/13/2019 to add text to reflect that Town of Kittery Maine was the defendant waiving service (mnw).
September 12, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION Motion to Expedite Briefing and Argument Schedule With Respect to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to TOWN OF BOWDOIN MAINE, TOWN OF KITTERY MAINE, TOWN OF WEST BATH MAINE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Town of Kittery, Maine summons, #2 Town of West Bath, Maine summons)(bfa)
September 12, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for JANET MILLS - Per Waiver of Service Executed #19: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (mnw)
September 12, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for AARON FREY - Per Waiver of Service Executed #18: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (mnw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER of Summons Governor JANET MILLS filed by COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER of Summons For Attorney General AARON FREY filed by COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Reserving Ruling re #15 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Argument Schedule With Respect to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, CBS CORP, C-SPAN, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, VIACOM INC, DISCOVERY INC, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC. The docket does not show service of process on most of the Defendants. Once service has been made and attorney appearances have been entered, the Court will convene a conference of counsel. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION Motion to Expedite Briefing and Argument Schedule With Respect to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by AARON FREY, JANET MILLS. Reply due by 9/25/2019. (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Argument Schedule With Respect to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, C-SPAN, CBS CORP, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, DISCOVERY INC, DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP, VIACOM INC Responses due by 10/2/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, C-SPAN, CBS CORP, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, DISCOVERY INC, DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP, VIACOM INC Responses due by 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rick Rioboli, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Peter Plaehn)(RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 10, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorneys MATTHEW A. BRILL, MATTHEW T. MURCHISON, RICHARD H. GRIFFIN, JESSICA L. SABA, MICHAEL H. HERMAN, MICHAEL D. HURWITZ, DAVID P. MURRAY & MELANIE A. MEDINA shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/17/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Melanie A. Medina filed by JOSHUA A. RANDLETT on behalf of COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2075743.) (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David P. Murray filed by JOSHUA A. RANDLETT on behalf of COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2075742.) (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael D. Hurwitz filed by JOSHUA A. RANDLETT on behalf of COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2075741.) (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael H. Herman filed by JOSHUA A. RANDLETT on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2075740.) (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jessica L. Saba filed by JOSHUA A. RANDLETT on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2075739.) (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard H. Griffin filed by JOSHUA A. RANDLETT on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2075738.) (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew T. Murchison filed by JOSHUA A. RANDLETT on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2075737.) (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew A. Brill filed by JOSHUA A. RANDLETT on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2075736.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment to Brill PHV Certification)(RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 9, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2075735.), filed by DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, CBS CORP, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, DISCOVERY INC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, VIACOM INC, C-SPAN.(RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA A. RANDLETT on behalf of All Plaintiffs (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #1 Complaint : incorrect document uploaded at case opening. (bfa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC, C-SPAN, CBS CORP, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, DISCOVERY INC, DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP, VIACOM INC. (bfa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF BATH MAINE, AARON FREY, JANET MILLS, TOWN OF BERWICK MAINE, TOWN OF BOWDOIN MAINE, TOWN OF BOWDOINHAM MAINE, TOWN OF BRUNSWICK MAINE, TOWN OF DURHAM MAINE, TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE, TOWN OF FREEPORT MAINE, TOWN OF HARPSWELL MAINE, TOWN OF KITTERY MAINE, TOWN OF PHIPPSBURG MAINE, TOWN OF SOUTH BERWICK MAINE, TOWN OF TOPSHAM MAINE, TOWN OF WEST BATH MAINE, TOWN OF WOOLWICH MAINE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC, CBS CORP, NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP, COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC, FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC, DISCOVERY INC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC, VIACOM INC, C-SPAN. (Service of Process Deadline 12/5/2019) Fee due by 9/9/2019.(bfa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/9/2019) (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC et al v. MILLS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF BOWDOIN MAINE
Represented By: JOHN W. CONWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF WOOLWICH MAINE
Represented By: KRISTIN M. COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF BOWDOINHAM MAINE
Represented By: PHILIP R. SAUCIER
Represented By: EBEN M. ALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF HARPSWELL MAINE
Represented By: AMY K. TCHAO
Represented By: JEFFREY T. PIAMPIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF TOPSHAM MAINE
Represented By: PHILIP R. SAUCIER
Represented By: EBEN M. ALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF BERWICK MAINE
Represented By: PHILIP R. SAUCIER
Represented By: EBEN M. ALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF KITTERY MAINE
Represented By: SALLY J. DAGGETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF BRUNSWICK MAINE
Represented By: KRISTIN M. COLLINS
Represented By: STEPHEN E. F. LANGSDORF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET MILLS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF PHIPPSBURG MAINE
Represented By: JESSICA L. MAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF FREEPORT MAINE
Represented By: PHILIP R. SAUCIER
Represented By: EBEN M. ALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF WEST BATH MAINE
Represented By: SALLY J. DAGGETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON FREY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE
Represented By: PHILIP R. SAUCIER
Represented By: EBEN M. ALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF DURHAM MAINE
Represented By: JOHN W. CONWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF SOUTH BERWICK MAINE
Represented By: PHILIP R. SAUCIER
Represented By: EBEN M. ALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF BATH MAINE
Represented By: ROGER R. THERRIAULT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBS CORP
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: JESSICA L. SABA
Represented By: RICHARD H. GRIFFIN
Represented By: MICHAEL H. HERMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW T. MURCHISON
Represented By: MATTHEW A. BRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISCOVERY INC
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: JESSICA L. SABA
Represented By: RICHARD H. GRIFFIN
Represented By: MICHAEL H. HERMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW T. MURCHISON
Represented By: MATTHEW A. BRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: MELANIE A. MEDINA
Represented By: MICHAEL D. HURWITZ
Represented By: DAVID P. MURRAY
Represented By: JESSICA L. SABA
Represented By: RICHARD H. GRIFFIN
Represented By: MICHAEL H. HERMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW T. MURCHISON
Represented By: MATTHEW A. BRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: JESSICA L. SABA
Represented By: RICHARD H. GRIFFIN
Represented By: MICHAEL H. HERMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW T. MURCHISON
Represented By: MATTHEW A. BRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: JESSICA L. SABA
Represented By: RICHARD H. GRIFFIN
Represented By: MICHAEL H. HERMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW T. MURCHISON
Represented By: MATTHEW A. BRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&E TELEVISION NETWORKS LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: JESSICA L. SABA
Represented By: RICHARD H. GRIFFIN
Represented By: MICHAEL H. HERMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW T. MURCHISON
Represented By: MATTHEW A. BRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C-SPAN
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: JESSICA L. SABA
Represented By: RICHARD H. GRIFFIN
Represented By: MICHAEL H. HERMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW T. MURCHISON
Represented By: MATTHEW A. BRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISNEY ENTERPRISES INC
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: JESSICA L. SABA
Represented By: RICHARD H. GRIFFIN
Represented By: MICHAEL H. HERMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW T. MURCHISON
Represented By: MATTHEW A. BRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIACOM INC
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: JESSICA L. SABA
Represented By: RICHARD H. GRIFFIN
Represented By: MICHAEL H. HERMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW T. MURCHISON
Represented By: MATTHEW A. BRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: MELANIE A. MEDINA
Represented By: MICHAEL D. HURWITZ
Represented By: DAVID P. MURRAY
Represented By: JESSICA L. SABA
Represented By: RICHARD H. GRIFFIN
Represented By: MICHAEL H. HERMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW T. MURCHISON
Represented By: MATTHEW A. BRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BROADCASTERS
Represented By: ERIN LORRAINE DOZIER
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK
Represented By: STEPHEN BLAKE KINNAIRD
Represented By: RICHARD ADAM KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MAINE ASSOCIATION OF BROADCASTERS
Represented By: ERIN LORRAINE DOZIER
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK
Represented By: STEPHEN BLAKE KINNAIRD
Represented By: RICHARD ADAM KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION INC
Represented By: OSCAR RAMALLO
Represented By: JOHN C. ULIN
Represented By: JAMES S. BLACKBURN
Represented By: WILLIAM KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?