SZILLERY v. UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM
Not Yet Classified: TRUSTEE
Appellee: UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM
Appellant: EVA JULIA SZILLERY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00422
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER - duplicate of ECF #7 MOTION to Withdraw and Discard the Disfigured Record by EVA JULIA SZILLERY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope addressed to Michelle Thibodeau)(tcs)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER - duplicate of ECF #7 MOTION to Withdraw and Discard the Disfigured Record by EVA JULIA SZILLERY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope addressed to Judge Woodcock)(tcs)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Appeal Procedural Order Appellant(s) Brief and Appendix due by 11/20/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK:Michelle Thibodeau. (mjlt)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw and Discard the Disfigured Record by EVA JULIA SZILLERY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Letter, #3 Envelope)(tcs)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Certificate of Readiness received. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issues To Be Presented, #2 Notice of Recipients)(mjlt)
October 8, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney ANDREW M. DUDLEY shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 10/11/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mjlt)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #1 BANKRUPTCY Appeal. Bankruptcy Court case number 05-11636. : The U.S. District Court's docket was modified to reflect the University of Maine System is not the appellee for the proceeding before this Court. According to the ECF [1-1] transmittal form, there was no appellee designated for this appeal. The District Court will await the receipt of the certificate of readiness to update the docket accordingly. (mjlt)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (slg)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent to Eva J. Szillery from Alec Leddy, Clerk of Court, USBC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Letter to Alec Leddy Clerk of Court USBC, #2 Envelope)(slg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY Appeal (the record on appeal is available at ecf.meb.uscourts.gov) received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court; Bankruptcy Court case number 05-11636., filed by EVA JULIA SZILLERY. (Check for Bankruptcy Appeal Certificate of Readiness 10/28/2019.) (Attachments: #1 transmittal form, #2 minute order, #3 docket sheet)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SZILLERY v. UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TRUSTEE
Represented By: ANDREW M. DUDLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM
Represented By: ALLISON A. ECONOMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: EVA JULIA SZILLERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?