PURINGTON-BAILEY v. WALMART INC
Plaintiff: MARY PURINGTON-BAILEY
Defendant: WALMART INC and WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00424
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXIS G. CHARDON on behalf of MARY PURINGTON-BAILEY (CHARDON, ALEXIS)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
September 20, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/27/2019 as to WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (akr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP.(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against WALMART INC, filed by MARY PURINGTON-BAILEY. (Service of Process Deadline 12/18/2019)(GOLDBERG, GARY)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting without objection #8 Motion for Leave to File amended complaint. REMINDER: Upon entry of this order, counsel for the plaintiff shall separately file the Amended Complaint document, ECF No. 8-1, as a separate filing on the court's docket forthwith. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by MARY PURINGTON-BAILEY Responses due by 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(GOLDBERG, GARY) Modified on 9/18/2019 to clean up docket text (akr).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/3/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/10/2020. Motions due by 2/24/2020. Ready for Trial on 5/5/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)
September 16, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2079151.), filed by WALMART INC.(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALMART INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by WALMART INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by WALMART INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
September 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for WALMART INC : Answer due by 9/23/2019. (bfa)
September 16, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/23/2019. (bfa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 9/23/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kennebec County Superior Court, case number AUGSC-CV-2019-00174. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WALMART INC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/16/2019) Fee due by 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 summons)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PURINGTON-BAILEY v. WALMART INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY PURINGTON-BAILEY
Represented By: GARY GOLDBERG
Represented By: ALEXIS G. CHARDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC
Represented By: DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Represented By: DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?