US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. FITZGERALD
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Defendant: SCOTT T FITZGERALD
Interested Party: UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS and LYANNE LEMUNIER-FITZGERALD
Case Number: 1:2019cv00443
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to SCOTT T FITZGERALD and UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS on 12/2/2019. (tcs)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS served on 10/3/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
October 31, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to SCOTT T FITZGERALD on 12/2/2019. (tcs)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. SCOTT T FITZGERALD served on 10/8/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
September 30, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2086304.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SCOTT T FITZGERALD, LYANNE LEMUNIER-FITZGERALD, UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Lyanne Lemunier-Fitzgerald summons, #2 Unifund CCR Partners summons)(bfa)
September 30, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/7/2019. (bfa)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SCOTT T FITZGERALD PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 12/30/2019) Fee due by 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Warranty Deed with Abstract Divorce Decree, #3 Exhibit C - Note, #4 Exhibit D Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into Citimortgage, #6 Exhibit F Assignment into Wilmington, #7 Exhibit G Assignment into Citimortgage, #8 Exhibit H Assignment into U.S. Bank, #9 Exhibit I Nunc Pro Tunc, #10 Exhibit J Demand Letters, #11 Exhibit K Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT T FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LYANNE LEMUNIER-FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?