AYIOMAMITIS v. MTM ACQUISITION INC
Plaintiff: ANTHONY AYIOMAMITIS
Defendant: MTM ACQUISITION INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00463
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties by MTM ACQUISITION INC (PIPER, BENJAMIN)
December 3, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/9/2019 from MTM ACQUISITION INC. (jwr)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Oppose Pro Hac Vice Admission by MTM ACQUISITION INC Responses due by 12/23/2019. (PIPER, BENJAMIN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by MTM ACQUISITION INC.(PIPER, BENJAMIN)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/11/2019. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
November 18, 2019 Set Deadlines Regarding Summons Returned Executed : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 12/18/2019 as to MTM ACQUISITION INC. (jwr)
November 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTHONY AYIOMAMITIS. MTM ACQUISITION INC served on 10/18/2019. (LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD)
October 28, 2019 Reset Deadlines per ECF No. 6: In accordance with Local Rule 83.1: Appearance of Local Counsel and Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 11/22/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jgd)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to Associate with Local Counsel and File Pro Hac Vice Certification. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jgd)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time Associate with Local Counsel and File Pro Hac Vice Motion by ANTHONY AYIOMAMITIS Responses due by 11/18/2019. (LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD)
October 21, 2019 Set Deadlines In accordance with Local Rule 83.1: Appearance of Local Counsel and Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 10/28/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (mjlt)
October 18, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2095795.), filed by ANTHONY AYIOMAMITIS.(LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD)
October 16, 2019 **SECOND NOTICE** RESET Deadlines : Filing Fee due by 10/17/2019. (jwr)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MTM ACQUISITION INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; copy e-mailed to U.S Copyright Office. (bfa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MTM ACQUISITION INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ANTHONY AYIOMAMITIS. (Service of Process Deadline 1/9/2020) Fee due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Analemma over Greece Photograph, #2 Exhibit B - articles and screenshots of the photograph on the Websites)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AYIOMAMITIS v. MTM ACQUISITION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY AYIOMAMITIS
Represented By: RICHARD P. LIEBOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTM ACQUISITION INC
Represented By: BENJAMIN S. PIPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?