BAILEY v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: LESLIE D BAILEY
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00464
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER per Affidavit of Service filed this date, the United States Attorney for the District of Maine was served on 11/4/2019: Answer due by 1/3/2020. (lrc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by LESLIE D BAILEY. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DILWORTH, CHRISTOPHER)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD W. MAKAWA on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (MAKAWA, RONALD)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Attorney General summons, #2 U.S. Attorney summons)(bfa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LESLIE D BAILEY (bfa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by LESLIE D BAILEY. (Service of Process Deadline 1/9/2020)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAILEY v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE D BAILEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER W. DILWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Represented By: RONALD W. MAKAWA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?