BAINES et al v. DUNLAP
Plaintiff: JAMES BAINES, CODY BLACKBURN, CHRISTOPHER LYONS, LIBERTARIAN PARTY OF MAINE, BONNIE YOUNG, ALLEN ESPOSITO and WILLIAM SAMPSON
Defendant: MATTHEW DUNLAP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00509
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William P. Tedards, Jr. filed by OLIVER B. HALL on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2135718.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously submitted an e-filing request with the District of Maine, you will now need to register for PRO HAC VICE filing rights in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (HALL, OLIVER)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting without objection #9 Joint Objection to Scheduling Order. The court's scheduling order, ECF No. 8, is amended to enlarge the deposition limit to seven per side and to extend the deadline for service of initial disclosures to January 9, 2020. All other limitations and deadlines in the court's scheduling order shall otherwise remain in effect. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
December 24, 2019 Filing 9 Joint OBJECTION to #8 Scheduling Order and Proposed Alterations filed by MATTHEW DUNLAP. Responses due by 1/14/2020. (GARDINER, PHYLLIS)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/23/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 4/30/2020. Motions due by 5/14/2020. Ready for Trial on 7/7/2020. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by MATTHEW DUNLAP.(GARDINER, PHYLLIS)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PHYLLIS GARDINER on behalf of MATTHEW DUNLAP (GARDINER, PHYLLIS)
November 21, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Affidavit of Service for MATTHEW DUNLAP : Answer due by 12/3/2019. (jwr)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by BONNIE YOUNG, CHRISTOPHER LYONS, WILLIAM SAMPSON, CODY BLACKBURN, JAMES BAINES, LIBERTARIAN PARTY OF MAINE, ALLEN ESPOSITO. MATTHEW DUNLAP served on 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(HALL, OLIVER)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW DUNLAP. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (jwr)
November 5, 2019 Filing Fee Received : Amount Paid: $100. Receipt Number: 220000158. Method of Payment: credit card. Purpose of Payment: Pro Hac Vice payment for Oliver B. Hall. Date Paid: 11/5/2019 (bfa)
November 5, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2104488.), filed by BONNIE YOUNG, CHRISTOPHER LYONS, WILLIAM SAMPSON, CODY BLACKBURN, JAMES BAINES, LIBERTARIAN PARTY OF MAINE, ALLEN ESPOSITO.(HALL, OLIVER)
November 1, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Oliver Hall shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 11/4/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mjlt)
November 1, 2019 Deadlines Attorney Oliver Hall shall pay the $100 Pro Hac Vice Fee : Fee due by 11/4/2019. (mjlt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Oliver B. Hall filed by JAMES BAINES, CODY BLACKBURN, ALLEN ESPOSITO, LIBERTARIAN PARTY OF MAINE, CHRISTOPHER LYONS, WILLIAM SAMPSON, BONNIE YOUNG (Filing fee $ 100.) (mjlt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mjlt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MATTHEW DUNLAP PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BONNIE YOUNG, CHRISTOPHER LYONS, WILLIAM SAMPSON, CODY BLACKBURN, JAMES BAINES, LIBERTARIAN PARTY OF MAINE, ALLEN ESPOSITO. (Service of Process Deadline 1/30/2020) Fee due by 11/4/2019.(nrg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAINES et al v. DUNLAP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BAINES
Represented By: OLIVER B. HALL
Represented By: JOHN H. BRANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CODY BLACKBURN
Represented By: OLIVER B. HALL
Represented By: JOHN H. BRANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER LYONS
Represented By: OLIVER B. HALL
Represented By: JOHN H. BRANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIBERTARIAN PARTY OF MAINE
Represented By: OLIVER B. HALL
Represented By: JOHN H. BRANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONNIE YOUNG
Represented By: OLIVER B. HALL
Represented By: JOHN H. BRANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN ESPOSITO
Represented By: JOHN H. BRANSON
Represented By: OLIVER B. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM SAMPSON
Represented By: OLIVER B. HALL
Represented By: JOHN H. BRANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW DUNLAP
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?