COULOMBE v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: AMANDA L COULOMBE
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00539
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER : Answer due by 2/4/2020. (tcs)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by AMANDA L COULOMBE. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER served on 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proofs of Service)(BENOIT, HENRI)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY S. BOLEN on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (BOLEN, TIMOTHY)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by AMANDA L COULOMBE Responses due by 12/23/2019. (BENOIT, HENRI)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney summons, #2 Attorney General summons)(bfa)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by AMANDA L COULOMBE. (Service of Process Deadline 2/24/2020) Fee due by 11/29/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COULOMBE v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA L COULOMBE
Represented By: HENRI A. BENOIT, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Represented By: TIMOTHY S. BOLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?