WHITTINGTON v. CITY OF BANGOR HALL
Plaintiff: RICHARD WHITTINGTON
Defendant: CITY OF BANGOR HALL
Case Number: 1:2019cv00553
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL - By Melody Dalphonse, Deputy Clerk (mnd)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE - adopting #5 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnd)
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL - By Melody Dalphonse, Deputy Clerk (mnd)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER mooting #6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnd)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE - adopting #5 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnd)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 Response to Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision filed by CITY OF BANGOR HALL. (COSTLOW, FREDERICK)
December 26, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER to plaintiff re: pro se handout. (jwr)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE re #8 Attachment 1: Medical Records to Objection to Report and Recommended Decision filed by RICHARD WHITTINGTON. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. Please also refer to the Information Handout for Pro Se Filers. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (jwr)
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 Certified Mail Service Returned on 11/5/2019 as to CITY OF BANGOR HALL. (jwr)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision filed by RICHARD WHITTINGTON. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Medical record)(jwr)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 MAIL (Recommended Decision) sent to Richard Whittington returned as undeliverable. Reason: Return for Postage. Remailed this date. (jwr)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction All Claims of Plaintiff Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1, 4, 5, & 6) by CITY OF BANGOR HALL Responses due by 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Defendant City of Bangor's Motion to Dismiss)(COSTLOW, FREDERICK)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint filed by RICHARD WHITTINGTON. Objections to R&R due by 1/2/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICHARD WHITTINGTON (jwr)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF BANGOR HALL filed by RICHARD WHITTINGTON. (Service of Process Deadline 3/4/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Pro Se Appearance/Notice of Claim, #2 Exhibits)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITTINGTON v. CITY OF BANGOR HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD WHITTINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF BANGOR HALL
Represented By: FREDERICK F. COSTLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?