PLOURDE v. REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL et al
Plaintiff: GLEN PLOURDE
Defendant: UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL NURSE #6, UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL AMBULANCE CREW MEMBER #1, UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL AMBULANCE CREW MEMBER #4, UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL AMBULANCE CREW MEMBER #5, REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL NURSE #3, UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL AMBULANCE CREW MEMBER #2, UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL NURSE #4, UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL AMBULANCE CREW MEMBER #3, UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL NURSE #1, UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL NURSE #5, UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL NURSE #2, UNKNOWN MAINE STATE CRISIS EMPLOYEE #2, UNKNOWN MAINE STATE CRISIS EMPLOYEE #4, UNKNOWN MAINE STATE CRISIS EMPLOYEE #3, UNKNOWN MAINE STATE CRISIS EMPLOYEE #5 and UNKNOWN MAINE STATE CRISIS EMPLOYEE #1
Case Number: 1:2020cv00011
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by GLEN PLOURDE. (Service of Process Deadline 6/1/2020) (Attachments: #1 A - Letter to LePage 7/20/2017, #2 B - Letter to LePage 10/17/2018, #3 C - State of Maine Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services, #4 D - Bangor Daily News Article 2/3/2020, #5 E - Emergency/Crisis Hotlines, #6 F - Crisis Help, #7 G - Adult Mental Health System, #8 H - Maine Crisis Hotline, #9 I - Crisis Response Services)(tcs)
February 18, 2020 Set Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 3/6/2020. (tcs)
February 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint. Because Plaintiff did not include a proposed amended complaint with his motion, the Court cannot determine whether Plaintiff's anticipated amended complaint will assert an actionable claim within the Court's jurisdiction. Upon the filing of the amended complaint, the Court will review the amended complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. section 1915. If Plaintiff intends to file an amended complaint, Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint on or before March 6, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by GLEN PLOURDE (tcs)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by GLEN PLOURDE (tcs)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #8 Report and Recommended Decision. filed by GLEN PLOURDE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D- Maine Focus Article, #2 Exhibit E- DHHS Emergency/Crisis Hotlines, #3 Exhibit F - DHHS Crisis Help, #4 Exhibit G- DHHS Adult Mental Health System, #5 Exhibit H - Crisis Hotline Number, #6 Exhibit I - Crisis Response Services Brochure)(tcs)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint, filed by GLEN PLOURDE. Objections to R&R due by 2/4/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
January 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk's Office re: "Information for Pro Se Parties". (jwr)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by GLEN PLOURDE (jwr)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GLEN PLOURDE. (jwr)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GLEN PLOURDE (jwr)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by GLEN PLOURDE. (Service of Process Deadline 4/9/2020) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter dated 7.20.17, #2 Exhibit B - Documentation Package 10.17.18, #3 Exhibit C - Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services, #4 Declaration of Glen Plourde)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PLOURDE v. REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL NURSE #6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL AMBULANCE CREW MEMBER #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL AMBULANCE CREW MEMBER #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL AMBULANCE CREW MEMBER #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL NURSE #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL AMBULANCE CREW MEMBER #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL NURSE #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL AMBULANCE CREW MEMBER #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL NURSE #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL NURSE #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN REDINGTON-FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL NURSE #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN MAINE STATE CRISIS EMPLOYEE #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN MAINE STATE CRISIS EMPLOYEE #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN MAINE STATE CRISIS EMPLOYEE #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN MAINE STATE CRISIS EMPLOYEE #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN MAINE STATE CRISIS EMPLOYEE #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLEN PLOURDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?