SOUCY v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: RICKY SOUCY, SR
Defendant: MAINE STATE PRISON and MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Not Classified By Court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Case Number: 1:2020cv00024
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020 : Service of Process Deadline 5/26/2020. (aks)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020 as to #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint filed by RICKY SOUCY, SR : Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 4/23/2020. (aks)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #13 Report and Recommended Decision. filed by RICKY SOUCY, SR. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Grieveance Form, #2 Physical Form, #3 Safety Data Sheet, #4 Envelope)(mlm)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint filed by RICKY SOUCY, SR. Objections to R&R due by 3/9/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Seal. The document attached to the motion does not appear to contain personal identifying information. Any objections to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff's complaint is amended to join Defendants Liberty, Fitzpatrick, and Breton as parties. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Redacted Document by RICKY SOUCY. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document, #2 Envelope)(mlm)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER from Clerks Office Regarding Collection of Fees (akr)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INDICATION by Prisoner RICKY SOUCY, SR of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(akr)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter MOTION to Amend Complaint by RICKY SOUCY, SR (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(akr)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 2/18/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE re: attachment 1 re #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by RICKY SOUCY, SR. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (bfa)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 2/18/2020. (MFS)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICKY SOUCY, SR (Attachments: #1 trust account statement)(bfa)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, MAINE STATE PRISON, filed by RICKY SOUCY, SR. (Service of Process Deadline 4/23/2020) (Attachments: #1 initial claim correspondence, #2 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUCY v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY SOUCY, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE STATE PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?