GRANDCHAMP v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Plaintiff: BRETT GRANDCHAMP
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00026
Filed: January 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020 : Service of Process Deadline 5/26/2020. (aks)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (tcs)
January 27, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BMEDC-2155174.), filed by BRETT GRANDCHAMP.(MEHNERT, ERIC)
January 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BRETT GRANDCHAMP. (Service of Process Deadline 4/23/2020) Fee due by 1/27/2020.(bfa) Modified on 1/27/2020 to correct filing date. (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRANDCHAMP v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT GRANDCHAMP
Represented By: ERIC M. MEHNERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?