FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. MOTTA
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Defendant: KELLI A MOTTA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00033
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines - Per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default deadline reset to 5/18/2020. (mnd)
March 18, 2020 Set Deadlines : No answer or responsive pleading filed by KELLI A MOTTA - Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 4/17/2020. (mnd)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. KELLI A MOTTA served on 2/8/2020. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
January 31, 2020 Filing Fee Received from FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2159654. Method of Payment: Pay.gov. Purpose of Payment: Case Opening Filing Fee. Date Paid: 01/31/2020 (mlm)
January 31, 2020 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/7/2020. (bfa)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KELLI A MOTTA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KELLI A MOTTA PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 4/30/2020) Fee due by 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into OneWest, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into Ocwen, #6 Exhibit F Assignment into FNMA, #7 Exhibit G Quitclaim Assignment, #8 Exhibit H Demand Letters, #9 Exhibit I Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. MOTTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLI A MOTTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?