UNITED OHIO INSURANCE COMPANY v. INSULATION OF MAINE INC et al
Plaintiff: UNITED OHIO INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: JACQUELYN COLLINS, ISAAC DWORSKY and INSULATION OF MAINE INC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00052
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by UNITED OHIO INSURANCE COMPANY (WHITMAN, JOHN)
March 4, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for INSULATION OF MAINE INC per summons returned executed ECF No. 7: Answer due by 3/19/2020. (slg)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED OHIO INSURANCE COMPANY. INSULATION OF MAINE INC served on 2/27/2020. (WHITMAN, JOHN)
February 28, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for ISAAC DWORSKY - Per Summons Returned Executed #6: Answer due by 3/16/2020. (mnd)
February 28, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for JACQUELYN COLLINS - Per Summons Returned Executed #5: Answer due by 3/16/2020. (mnd)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED OHIO INSURANCE COMPANY. ISAAC DWORSKY served on 2/24/2020. (WHITMAN, JOHN)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED OHIO INSURANCE COMPANY. JACQUELYN COLLINS served on 2/24/2020. (WHITMAN, JOHN) Modified on 2/28/2020 to correct name of party served after call from counsel that they selected the wrong party name (mtm).
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UNITED OHIO INSURANCE COMPANY. (WHITMAN, JOHN)
February 13, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2169990.), filed by UNITED OHIO INSURANCE COMPANY.(WHITMAN, JOHN)
February 13, 2020 Set Deadlines as to UNITED OHIO INSURANCE COMPANY: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/20/2020. (clp)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JACQUELYN COLLINS, ISAAC DWORSKY, INSULATION OF MAINE INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: Main Document-Insulation of Maine Inc Summons #1 Isaac Dworsky Summons, #2 Jacquelyn Collins Summons)(clp)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JACQUELYN COLLINS, ISAAC DWORSKY, INSULATION OF MAINE INC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by UNITED OHIO INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 5/13/2020) Fee due by 2/18/2020.(clp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED OHIO INSURANCE COMPANY v. INSULATION OF MAINE INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED OHIO INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN S. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELYN COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISAAC DWORSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSULATION OF MAINE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?