NERVAL v. WORCESTER
Petitioner: DOMINIC NERVAL
Respondent: RUSSELL WORCESTER
Interested Party: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - HABEAS CASES
Case Number: 1:2020cv00122
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER/RESPONSE/REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF #1 filed by RUSSELL WORCESTER. Reply due by 6/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(MACOMBER, DONALD)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO ANSWER #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 6/1/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:20-cv-10376. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred to District of Maine. (Kelly, Danielle) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/1/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Indira Talwani: Electronic Order: This court lacks jurisdiction over Petitioner Dominic Nerval's Petition under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 as Petitioner states that he is currently incarcerated in Bolduc Correctional Facility in Maine. However, the court finds, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1631, that transfer of the petition to the district where the petition could have been brought at the time it was originally filed is in the interest of justice. Accordingly, the clerk shall transfer the case to the United States District Court for the District of Maine. (Kelly, Danielle) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/1/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee/payment: $5.00, receipt number 1BST078982 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Coppola, Katelyn) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/1/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/1/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254, filed by Dominic Nerval. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Currie, Haley) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NERVAL v. WORCESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RUSSELL WORCESTER
Represented By: DONALD W. MACOMBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DOMINIC NERVAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - HABEAS CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?