TOMELLERI v. PATTERSON et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH R TOMELLERI
Defendant: SANDY PATTERSON and PATRICK PATTERSON
Case Number: 1:2020cv00139
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Set Deadlines defendants answers were due 6/9/2020 and as of this date no answer or responsive pleading has been filed: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 7/13/2020. (lrc)
May 29, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for PATRICK PATTERSON and SANDY PATTERSON per Summons returned executed filed this date: Answers due by 6/9/2020. (lrc)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSEPH R TOMELLERI. SANDY PATTERSON served on 5/19/2020. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSEPH R TOMELLERI. PATRICK PATTERSON served on 5/19/2020. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott J. Strohm filed by BERNARD J. KUBETZ on behalf of JOSEPH R TOMELLERI (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2223214.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to PATRICK PATTERSON, SANDY PATTERSON. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Sandy Patterson summons)(bfa)
April 23, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2215734.), filed by JOSEPH R TOMELLERI.(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
April 22, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Scott J. Strohm must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 5/6/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 5/6/2020. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (bfa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; copy e-mailed to U.S Copyright Office. (bfa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PATRICK PATTERSON, SANDY PATTERSON with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JOSEPH R TOMELLERI. (Service of Process Deadline 7/21/2020) Fee due by 4/24/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOMELLERI v. PATTERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDY PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH R TOMELLERI
Represented By: SCOTT J. STROHM
Represented By: BERNARD J. KUBETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?