CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR v. MILLS
Plaintiff: CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR
Defendant: JANET MILLS
Petitioner: AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00156
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Terminating as Moot #22 Motion for Leave to File By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Stay By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
May 25, 2020 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings Pending Appeal by JANET MILLS Responses due by 6/15/2020. (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
May 21, 2020 Reset Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorneys HORATIO G. MIHET & ROGER K. GANNAM must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 6/4/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (mnd)
May 18, 2020 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #28 Notice of Appeal (bfa)
May 18, 2020 Filing 34 CLERK'S First SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE Re: #28 Notice of Appeal. Documents Sent to U.S. Court of Appeals (bfa)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying for reasons stated in my Order of May 9, 2020 #32 Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB) Modified on 5/19/2020 to add text - for reasons stated in my Order of May 9, 2020 (mnd).
May 13, 2020 Filing 32 Emergency MOTION Injunction Pending Appeal by CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR Responses due by 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sixth Circuit Injunction Pending Appeal as to In-Person Gatherings, #2 Exhibit B - Western District of Kentucky Injunction Pending Appeal Concerning In-Person Services, #3 Exhibit C - Eastern District of Kentucky Temporary Restraining Order)(SCHMID, DANIEL)
May 11, 2020 Filing 31 USCA Case Number 20-1507 for #28 Notice of Appeal, filed by CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR. (bfa)
May 11, 2020 Abbreviated Appeal Record Transmitted Electronically to U.S. Court of Appeals re #28 Notice of Appeal (bfa)
May 11, 2020 Filing 30 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE Re: #28 Notice of Appeal. Documents sent to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (bfa)
May 11, 2020 Filing 29 APPEAL COVER SHEET Re: #28 Notice of Appeal (bfa)
May 9, 2020 Filing 28 INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL filed by CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR re: #27 Order denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number AMEDC-2226178.) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from our web site at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms/ MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel should also register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf and review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (SCHMID, DANIEL) Modified on 5/11/2020 to clean up text (mnd).
May 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #3 Motion for TRO. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
May 9, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Supplemental Authority on Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO by CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sixth Circuit Opinion)(SCHMID, DANIEL)
May 9, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Supplemental Authority on Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO by CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Western District of Kentucky IPA Enjoining Enforcement on In-Person Religious Gatherings, #2 Exhibit Eastern District Of Kentucky State-Wide Injunction)(SCHMID, DANIEL)
May 8, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney KENNETH DALE UPTON, JR must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 5/22/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (mnd)
May 8, 2020 Filing 24 BRIEF re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE. (SOLEY, DAVID)
May 8, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JANET MILLS. Reply due by 5/22/2020. (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
May 8, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File to File Amicus Brief by AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE Responses due by 5/29/2020. (SOLEY, DAVID)
May 8, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Derek Langhauser filed by JANET MILLS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A (Email from Maine Council of Churches))(TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
May 8, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Nirav Dinesh Shah, M.D., J.D. filed by JANET MILLS. (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
May 8, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth D. Upton, Jr. filed by DAVID SOLEY on behalf of AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2225820.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (SOLEY, DAVID)
May 8, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexander J. Luchenister filed by DAVID SOLEY on behalf of AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2225817.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (SOLEY, DAVID)
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard B. Katskee filed by DAVID SOLEY on behalf of AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2225814.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (SOLEY, DAVID)
May 8, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah R. Goetz filed by DAVID SOLEY on behalf of AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2225793.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (SOLEY, DAVID)
May 8, 2020 Filing Fee Received from CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR: Amount Paid: 400.00. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2225306. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Civil Case Opening Filing Fee. Date Paid: 5/8/2020. (mnd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Horatio G. Mihet Providing the Court with Supplemental Information Requested at the May 7, 2020 Status Conference filed by CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR. (SCHMID, DANIEL)
May 7, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Response due by 5:00 p.m. on 5/8/2020. (mnd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Telephone Conference held. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (mnd)
May 7, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for JANET MILLS - Per Summons Returned Executed #13: Answer due by 5/27/2020. (mnd) Modified on 5/7/2020 to correct date filed to be 5/7/2020 (mnd).
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR. JANET MILLS served on 5/6/2020. (SCHMID, DANIEL)
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 9:00 AM before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Counsel have been provided with the call-in information.(mnd)
May 6, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorneys HORATIO G. MIHET & ROGER K. GANNAM must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 5/20/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (mnd)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Telephone Conference held. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (mnd)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Schmid filed by DANIEL J. SCHMID on behalf of CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2223756.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (SCHMID, DANIEL)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Roger K. Gannam filed by DANIEL J. SCHMID on behalf of CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2223754.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (SCHMID, DANIEL)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Horatio G. Mihet filed by DANIEL J. SCHMID on behalf of CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2223751.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (SCHMID, DANIEL)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mathew D. Staver filed by DANIEL J. SCHMID on behalf of CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2223749.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (SCHMID, DANIEL)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 1:15 PM before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Counsel have been provided with the call-in information. (mnd)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR** ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR re #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Certificate for Admission pro Hac Vice/Horatio G. Mihet.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate for Admission Pro Hac Vice/Matthew D. Staver, #2 Certificate for Admission for Pro Hac Vice/ Daniel J. Schmid, #3 Certificate for Admission Pro Hac Vice/Roger K. Gannam)(HODSDON, CHARLES) Modified on 5/6/2020 to add filed in error notation. The Pro Hac Vice Certification Forms have been re-filed as ECF Nos. 7-10. (mnd).
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JANET MILLS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR Responses due by 5/26/2020. (bfa)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JANET MILLS PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR. (Service of Process Deadline 8/3/2020) Fee due by 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 15th Emergency Proclamation, #2 Exhibit B - Executive Order 14, #3 Exhibit C - Executive Order 19, #4 Exhibit D - Executive Order 28, #5 Exhibit E - Essential Business List, #6 Exhibit F - Proclamation Extension, #7 Exhibit G - Executive Order 49, #8 Exhibit H - Restarting Maines Economy plan, #9 Exhibit I - Maine State Polices Enforcement Practices Memorandum, #10 Exhibit J - Florida Executive Order 20-91, #11 Exhibit K - Indianas Executive Order 20-08, #12 Exhibit L - Arizona Executive Order 2020-18, #13 Exhibit M - Arizona Attorney General Opinion I20-008, #14 Exhibit N - Alabama Order, #15 Exhibit O - Arkansas Executive Order, #16 Exhibit P - Connecticut Executive Order No. 7N, #17 Exhibit Q - Texas Guidance for Houses of Worship, #18 Exhibit R - Ohio order, #19 Exhibit S - demand letter)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR v. MILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET MILLS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB
Represented By: SARAH A. FORSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALVARY CHAPEL OF BANGOR
Represented By: HORATIO G. MIHET
Represented By: CHARLES W. HODSDON, II
Represented By: MATHEW D. STAVER
Represented By: ROGER K. GANNAM
Represented By: DANIEL J. SCHMID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE
Represented By: DAVID SOLEY
Represented By: SARAH R. GOETZ
Represented By: RICHARD B. KATSKEE
Represented By: ALEXANDER JOSEPH LUCHENITSER
Represented By: KENNETH D. UPTON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?