HAGOPIAN et al v. DUNLAP et al
Case Number: 1:2020cv00257
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2280118.), filed by ROBERT HAGOPIAN, DUANE R LANDER, JAMES T TRUDEL, STERLING B ROBINSON.(BOPP, FRED)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS A. KNOWLTON on behalf of MATTHEW DUNLAP, AARON FREY, JANET MILLS (KNOWLTON, THOMAS)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by PHYLLIS GARDINER on behalf of MATTHEW DUNLAP, AARON FREY, JANET MILLS (GARDINER, PHYLLIS)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 7/27/2020 01:00 PM before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. Parties have been provided call in information via separate email. (meh)
July 23, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Stephen J. Obermeier, Attorney Michael E. Toner, Attorney Brandis L. Zehr, and Attorney Jeremy J. Broggi must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 7/30/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (meh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy J. Broggi filed by FRED W. BOPP, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2278790.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (BOPP, FRED)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brandis L. Zehr filed by FRED W. BOPP, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2278781.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (BOPP, FRED)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael E. Toner filed by FRED W. BOPP, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2278765.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (BOPP, FRED)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen J. Obermeier filed by FRED W. BOPP, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2278757.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (BOPP, FRED)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW DUNLAP, AARON FREY, JANET MILLS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Janet Mills summons, #2 Matthew Dunlap summons)(bfa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ROBERT HAGOPIAN, DUANE R LANDER, STERLING B ROBINSON, JAMES T TRUDEL Responses due by 8/12/2020. (bfa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MATTHEW DUNLAP, AARON FREY, JANET MILLS PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ROBERT HAGOPIAN, DUANE R LANDER, JAMES T TRUDEL, STERLING B ROBINSON. (Service of Process Deadline 10/20/2020) Fee due by 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Nolan McCarty, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Robert Hagopian, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Duane R. Lander, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Sterling B. Robinson, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of James T. Trudel)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAGOPIAN et al v. DUNLAP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?