JORGENSEN v DUNLAP
Plaintiff: JO JORGENSEN
Defendant: MATTHEW DUNLAP
Case Number: 1:2020cv00272
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by JO JORGENSEN (BARNES, ROBERT)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by MATTHEW DUNLAP. (Attachments: #1 Candidate Letter and Receipt)(GARDINER, PHYLLIS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 Motions terminated: #5 Motion for Expedited Hearing and #5 Motion for TRO terminated by the Clerk's Office following the 8/3/2020 Telephone Conference. As discussed during the Telephone Conference, this matter will proceed only on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mnd)
August 3, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Pursuant to the schedule established during the 8/3/2020 Telephone Conference: Response due by 8/10/2020. Reply due by 8/11/2020. (mnd)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Telephone Conference held. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (mnd)
August 3, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2285502.), filed by JO JORGENSEN.(BARNES, ROBERT)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS A. KNOWLTON on behalf of MATTHEW DUNLAP (KNOWLTON, THOMAS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by PHYLLIS GARDINER on behalf of MATTHEW DUNLAP (GARDINER, PHYLLIS)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 8/3/2020 11:00 AM before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. The parties have been provided with the call-in information.(jwr)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert E. Barnes filed by BRIAN H. MAHANY on behalf of JO JORGENSEN (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2284679.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (MAHANY, BRIAN)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW DUNLAP. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Expedited Hearing, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by JO JORGENSEN (bfa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of James Tracey re #1 Complaint, filed by JO JORGENSEN. (bfa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Christopher Thrasher re #1 Complaint, filed by JO JORGENSEN. (bfa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MATTHEW DUNLAP PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JO JORGENSEN. (Service of Process Deadline 10/29/2020) Fee due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proclamation, #2 Exhibit 2 - Executive Order dated March 18, 2020, #3 Exhibit 3 - Executive order dated March 24, 2020, #4 Exhibit 4 - Executive Order dated March 31, 2020, #5 Exhibit 5 - Proclamation to Renew the State of Civil Emergency, #6 Exhibit 6 - News Release dated June 5, 2020, #7 7 - Information for Voters for July 14 Election)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JORGENSEN v DUNLAP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JO JORGENSEN
Represented By: ROBERT E. BARNES
Represented By: BRIAN H. MAHANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW DUNLAP
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Represented By: THOMAS A. KNOWLTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?