BIRCH v. ETHICON INC et al
Plaintiff: JACKIE BIRCH
Defendant: ETHICON INC and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2020cv00278
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathleen M. Guilfoyle filed by KATHLEEN M. GUILFOYLE on behalf of ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2302286.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (GUILFOYLE, KATHLEEN)
August 24, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline for ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON per order #10: Answer due by 10/16/2020. (clp)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting without objection #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendants shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by October 16, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 ASSENTED to MOTION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint by ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (CAMPBELL, JAMES) Modified on 8/21/2020 to clean up docket text (clp).
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES M. CAMPBELL on behalf of ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
August 20, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON in accordance with ECF #6 Affidavit of Service filed served 8/11/2020: Answer due by 9/1/2020. (clp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JACKIE BIRCH. ETHICON INC served on 8/11/2020; JOHNSON & JOHNSON served on 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service of Defendants' by Electronic Mail)(LIZIK, DANA)
August 10, 2020 Filing Fee Received from JACKIE BIRCH: Amount Paid: 400.00. Receipt Number: 120000240. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 08/10/2020 (mtm)
August 6, 2020 Set Deadlines: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney DANA LIZIK must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 8/14/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (clp)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dana Lizik filed by BRETT D. BABER on behalf of JACKIE BIRCH (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2288758.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (BABER, BRETT)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER sent to MDL Panel. (bfa)
August 4, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Dana Lizik must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 8/11/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 8/11/2020. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (bfa)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Johnson & Johnson summons)(bfa)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JACKIE BIRCH. (Service of Process Deadline 11/2/2020) Fee due by 8/6/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIRCH v. ETHICON INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKIE BIRCH
Represented By: BRETT D. BABER
Represented By: DANA LIZIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON INC
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: KATHLEEN M. GUILFOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: KATHLEEN M. GUILFOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?