UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FLEWELLING
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JERRY W FLEWELLING, II
Interested Party: UAP DISTRIBUTION INC, CAVENDISH AGRI SERVICES INC and RICKY MCLAIN
Case Number: 1:2020cv00289
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to UAP DISTRIBUTION INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (meh)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to JERRY W FLEWELLING, II. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (meh)
September 23, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for RICKY MCLAIN : Answer due by 10/19/2020. (meh)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed RICKY MCLAIN waiver sent on 8/18/2020. (EILER, ASHLEY)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CAVENDISH AGRI SERVICES INC. (YORK, BRENT)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by CAVENDISH AGRI SERVICES INC.(YORK, BRENT)
August 25, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for CAVENDISH AGRI SERVICES INC : Answer due by 10/19/2020. (meh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed CAVENDISH AGRI SERVICES INC waiver sent on 8/18/2020. (EILER, ASHLEY)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Filing of Complaint for Foreclosure. Original attested document forwarded to the government. (lrt)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #1 Complaint. Main Document: Mortgage 6-9-2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P - Notice of Acceleration, #2 Exhibit Q - Am. Notice of Acceleration, #3 Exhibit R - Title Opinion Charge, #4 Exhibit S - Appraisal Fee, #5 Exhibit T - Tax Charge, #6 Exhibit U - Lien Search, #7 Exhibit V - UCC Charge, #8 Exhibit W - UCC Charge, #9 Exhibit X - Warranty Deed to Mclain, #10 Exhibit Y - Flewelling Discharge)(bfa)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JERRY W FLEWELLING, II, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 11/9/2020) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note 44-02, #2 Exhibit B - Promissory Note 44-06, #3 Exhibit C - Promissory Note 44-04, #4 Exhibit D - Promissory Note 44-05, #5 Exhibit E - Promissory Note 44-07, #6 Exhibit F - Promissory Note 44-09, #7 Exhibit G - Promissory Note 44-10, #8 Exhibit H - Mortgage 5-12-2000, #9 Exhibit I - Mortgage 6-19-2001, #10 Exhibit J - Mortgage 5-10-2002, #11 Exhibit K - Mortgage 7-24-2003, #12 Exhibit L - Mortgage 4-8-2004, #13 Exhibit M - Mortgage 6-29-2004, #14 Exhibit N - Mortgage 5-19-2005)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FLEWELLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UAP DISTRIBUTION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAVENDISH AGRI SERVICES INC
Represented By: BRENT A. YORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: RICKY MCLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY W FLEWELLING, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ASHLEY E. EILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?