BERNIER v. AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL
Plaintiff: LYLE BERNIER
Defendant: AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL
Case Number: 1:2020cv00303
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/28/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Subpoena Evidence. The Court has not at this point authorized discovery in this matter. In the event the Court authorizes discovery, Plaintiff can renew his request. Any objection to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Subpoena Evidence by LYLE BERNIER (Attachments: #1 Overview, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(tcs)
September 11, 2020 Set Deadlines: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 10/2/2020. (MFS)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 10/2/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LYLE BERNIER (Attachments: #1 Resident Consolidated Statement, #2 Envelope)(tcs)
August 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Subpoena Evidence. The Court has not at this point authorized discovery in this matter. In the event the Court authorizes discovery, Plaintiff can renew his request. Any objection to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 25, 2020 Set Deadlines: Filing Fee or IFP Application due by 9/15/2020. (MFS)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING FILING FEE. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Subpoena Evidence by LYLE BERNIER (bfa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by LYLE BERNIER. No PDF attached. See [#1] complaint (bfa) .
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LYLE BERNIER. (Service of Process Deadline 11/17/2020) Fee due by 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BERNIER v. AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYLE BERNIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?