MURCHIE et al v. DUBIE et al
Plaintiff: DEANNA MURCHIE and JESSE MURCHIE
Defendant: JANE DOE, EDWARD DUBIE, CITY OF FORT FAIRFIELD, FORT FAIRFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT, SHAWN NEWELL, JOHN DOE, RYAN EAGLES and JAMES RISER
Case Number: 1:2020cv00306
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for CITY OF FORT FAIRFIELD : Answer due by 11/3/2020. (aks)
September 11, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for FORT FAIRFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT : Answer due by 11/3/2020. (aks)
September 11, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for JAMES RISER : Answer due by 11/3/2020. (aks)
September 11, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for SHAWN NEWELL : Answer due by 11/3/2020. (aks)
September 11, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for EDWARD DUBIE : Answer due by 11/3/2020. (aks)
September 11, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for RYAN EAGLES : Answer due by 11/3/2020. (aks)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed CITY OF FORT FAIRFIELD waiver sent on 9/4/2020. (WILLEY, N.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed FORT FAIRFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT waiver sent on 9/4/2020. (WILLEY, N.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed JAMES RISER waiver sent on 9/4/2020. (WILLEY, N.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed SHAWN NEWELL waiver sent on 9/4/2020. (WILLEY, N.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed EDWARD DUBIE waiver sent on 9/4/2020. (WILLEY, N.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed RYAN EAGLES waiver sent on 9/4/2020. (WILLEY, N.)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CITY OF FORT FAIRFIELD. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CITY OF FORT FAIRFIELD, EDWARD DUBIE, RYAN EAGLES, FORT FAIRFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT, SHAWN NEWELL. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Shawn Newell summons, #2 James Riser summons, #3 Ryan Eagles summons, #4 Edward Dubie summons)(bfa)
August 21, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2300567.), filed by JESSE MURCHIE.(WILLEY, N.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF FORT FAIRFIELD, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, EDWARD DUBIE, RYAN EAGLES, FORT FAIRFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT, SHAWN NEWELL with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by DEANNA MURCHIE, JESSE MURCHIE. (Service of Process Deadline 11/19/2020) Fee due by 8/24/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURCHIE et al v. DUBIE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD DUBIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF FORT FAIRFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORT FAIRFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWN NEWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN EAGLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES RISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANNA MURCHIE
Represented By: EZRA A.R. WILLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE MURCHIE
Represented By: EZRA A.R. WILLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?