CARNEY et al v. HANCOCK COUNTY MAINE et al
Plaintiff: ROBERTA E WINCHELL, ESQ and STEW ART CARNEY, JR
Defendant: FRANK L SHEP ARD, AROOSTOOK MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES INC, KAYLA DUMOND, HANCOCK COUNTY MAINE, SCOTT KANE, ALICIA LAMBERT, TIMOTHY RICHARDSON, NOAH LEWEY, TRAVIS YOUNG, JOHN DOE, I, CHRISTOPHER STANLEY, JILLIAN JONES, W A SCHAFFER, JOHN DOE, 2 and RUSSELL WILSON
Case Number: 1:2020cv00349
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to ALICIA LAMBERT, W A SCHAFFER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons-Lambert) (jgd)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to AROOSTOOK MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES INC, KAYLA DUMOND, HANCOCK COUNTY MAINE, JILLIAN JONES, SCOTT KANE, NOAH LEWEY, TIMOTHY RICHARDSON, FRANK L SHEP ARD, CHRISTOPHER STANLEY, RUSSELL WILSON, TRAVIS YOUNG. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Frank Shepard Summons, #2 ACMH Summons, #3 Christopher Stanley Summons, #4 Scott Kane Summons, #5 Timothy Richardson Summons, #6 Travis Young Summons, #7 Jillian Jones Summons, #8 Kayla Dumond Summons, #9 Noah Lewey Summons, #10 Russell Wilson Summons)(meh)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 *FILED IN ERROR* Summons Issued as to KAYLA DUMOND. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (meh) Modified on 10/27/2020 to indicate it was filed in error as address for defendant was incorrect (meh).
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by HANCOCK COUNTY MAINE, JILLIAN JONES, SCOTT KANE, NOAH LEWEY, TIMOTHY RICHARDSON, FRANK L SHEP ARD, CHRISTOPHER STANLEY, RUSSELL WILSON, TRAVIS YOUNG.(MARCHESI, PETER)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT J. LYNCH on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LYNCH, SCOTT)
September 28, 2020 Filing Fee Received from STEW ART CARNEY, JR, ROBERTA E WINCHELL, ESQ: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 220001512. Method of Payment: credit card. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 9/28/20 re #1 Complaint. (bfa)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AROOSTOOK MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES INC, JOHN DOE, I, JOHN DOE, 2, KAYLA DUMOND, HANCOCK COUNTY MAINE, JILLIAN JONES, SCOTT KANE, ALICIA LAMBERT, NOAH LEWEY, TIMOTHY RICHARDSON, W A SCHAFFER, FRANK L SHEP ARD, CHRISTOPHER STANLEY, RUSSELL WILSON, TRAVIS YOUNG PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by STEW ART CARNEY, JR, ROBERTA E WINCHELL, ESQ. (Service of Process Deadline 12/24/2020) Fee due by 9/28/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARNEY et al v. HANCOCK COUNTY MAINE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK L SHEP ARD
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AROOSTOOK MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAYLA DUMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANCOCK COUNTY MAINE
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT KANE
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALICIA LAMBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY RICHARDSON
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOAH LEWEY
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVIS YOUNG
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER STANLEY
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILLIAN JONES
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W A SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSELL WILSON
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTA E WINCHELL, ESQ
Represented By: CARL D. MCCUE
Represented By: SCOTT J. LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEW ART CARNEY, JR
Represented By: CARL D. MCCUE
Represented By: SCOTT J. LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?