WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 v. FARRIS et al
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1
Defendant: ARTHUR B FARRIS, IV and SHELLIE R FARRIS
Interested Party: SAVINGS BANK OF MAINE, MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR and MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2021cv00082
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, ARTHUR B FARRIS, IV and SHELLIE R FARRIS on 6/7/2021. (tcs)
May 6, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, MIDLAND FUNDING LLC and ARTHUR B FARRIS, IV on 6/7/2021. (tcs)
April 30, 2021 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR & MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 6/1/2021. (tcs)
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1. ARTHUR B FARRIS, IV served on 4/14/2021. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 27, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1. SHELLIE R FARRIS served on 4/15/2021. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 27, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for ARTHUR B FARRIS, IV: Answer due by 5/5/2021. (tcs)
April 27, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for SHELLIE R FARRIS : Answer due by 5/6/2021. (tcs)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Priority Position)(CROSMAN, KEVIN)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1. MAINE REVENUE SERVICES served on 4/8/2021. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 4/8/2021. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1. MIDLAND FUNDING LLC served on 4/8/2021. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 16, 2021 Set Answer Deadlines for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES: Answers due by 4/29/2021. (tcs)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ARTHUR B FARRIS, IV, SHELLIE R FARRIS, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, SAVINGS BANK OF MAINE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Arthur B. Farris, IV summons, #2 Maine Department of Labor summons, #3 Midland Funding LLC, #4 Savings Bank of Maine summons, #5 Maine Revenue Services summons)(bfa)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARTHUR B FARRIS, IV, SHELLIE R FARRIS PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1. (Service of Process Deadline 6/24/2021) Fee due by 3/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Everhome Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into GreenTree Servicing, #6 Exhibit F Ratification of Assignment into Everhome Mortgage, #7 Exhibit G Assignment into Federal National Mortgage Association, #8 Exhibit H Assignment into Federal National Mortgage Association, #9 Exhibit I Assignment into MTGLQ Investors LP, #10 Exhibit J Rescission of Assignment of Mortgage to Federal National Mortgage Association, #11 Exhibit K Assignment into Wilmington Trust, #12 Exhibit L Quitclaim Assignment into Wilmington Trust, #13 Exhibit M Demand Letter, #14 Exhibit N Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)
March 26, 2021 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/2/2021. (bfa)
March 26, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2469578.), filed by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 v. FARRIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SAVINGS BANK OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Represented By: KEVIN J. CROSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTHUR B FARRIS, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELLIE R FARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?