DESCHAINE v. CRD METALWORKS LLC et al
Plaintiff: DONALD DESCHAINE
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER M DUVAL and CRD METALWORKS LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00092
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Time is extended to July 30, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 22, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Deadline to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by DONALD DESCHAINE Responses due by 7/13/2021. (SACKS, DOV)
June 22, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per order #17: Responses due by 7/30/2021. (clp)
June 8, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by CHRISTOPHER M DUVAL in support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (WYCOFF, ERIC)
June 8, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by CHRISTOPHER M DUVAL Responses due by 6/29/2021. (WYCOFF, ERIC)
June 8, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CRD METALWORKS LLC. (WYCOFF, ERIC)
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by CRD METALWORKS LLC.(WYCOFF, ERIC)
June 4, 2021 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorneys MARK A. TANNER and RYAN K. O'HARA must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 6/11/2021. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (clp)
June 3, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan K. O'Hara filed by ERIC J. WYCOFF on behalf of CRD METALWORKS LLC, CHRISTOPHER M DUVAL (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2500885.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (WYCOFF, ERIC)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark A. Tanner filed by ERIC J. WYCOFF on behalf of CRD METALWORKS LLC, CHRISTOPHER M DUVAL (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2500883.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (WYCOFF, ERIC)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to June 8, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by CRD METALWORKS LLC, CHRISTOPHER M DUVAL Responses due by 6/14/2021. (WYCOFF, ERIC)
May 24, 2021 Reset Answer Deadline for CHRISTOPHER M DUVAL per order #9: Answer due by 6/8/2021. (clp)
May 24, 2021 Reset Answer Deadline for CRD METALWORKS LLC per order #9: Answer due by 6/8/2021. (clp)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DONALD DESCHAINE. CHRISTOPHER M DUVAL served on 5/4/2021. (SACKS, DOV)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DONALD DESCHAINE. CRD METALWORKS LLC served on 5/4/2021. (SACKS, DOV)
May 10, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for CHRISTOPHER M DUVAL in accordance with ECF #7 Summons Returned Executed served 5/4/2021: Answer due by 5/25/2021. (clp)
May 10, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for CRD METALWORKS LLC in accordance with ECF #6 Summons Returned Executed served 5/4/2021: Answer due by 5/25/2021. (clp)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES E. O'CONNELL III on behalf of DONALD DESCHAINE (O'CONNELL III, JAMES)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ALICIA F. CURTIS on behalf of DONALD DESCHAINE (CURTIS, ALICIA)
April 2, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2472872.), filed by DONALD DESCHAINE.(SACKS, DOV)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CRD METALWORKS LLC, CHRISTOPHER M DUVAL. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Christopher Duval summons)(bfa)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CRD METALWORKS LLC, CHRISTOPHER M DUVAL with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by DONALD DESCHAINE. (Service of Process Deadline 6/30/2021) Fee due by 4/5/2021.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DESCHAINE v. CRD METALWORKS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER M DUVAL
Represented By: ERIC J. WYCOFF
Represented By: MARK A. TANNER
Represented By: RYAN K. O'HARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRD METALWORKS LLC
Represented By: ERIC J. WYCOFF
Represented By: MARK A. TANNER
Represented By: RYAN K. O'HARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD DESCHAINE
Represented By: DOV SACKS
Represented By: JAMES E. O'CONNELL III
Represented By: ALICIA F. CURTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?