HEWES v. PUSHARD et al
Plaintiff: LIBBY HEWES
Defendant: JANE DOE, JACKIE PUSHARD, BENJAMIN PUSHARD, BREWER SCHOOL SYSTEM, JOHN DOE, PHIL PUSHARD, HEALY CHIROPRACTIC LLC, MATTHEW PUSHARD, SAMANTHA PANGBURN, MORGAN SMALL, PATRICK HEALY, JACQUELINE PUSHARD, PHILLIP PUSHARD, OFFICER JOHN/JANE DOE, GREGG PALMER and GRETCHEN GARDINER
Case Number: 1:2021cv00125
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for BENJAMIN PUSHARD in accordance with ECF #23 Summons Returned Executed served 6/28/2021: Answer due by 7/26/2021. (clp)
July 6, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LIBBY HEWES. BENJAMIN PUSHARD served on 6/28/2021. (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 7/7/2021 to correct date served to 6/28/2021 per date indicated on document (clp).
July 2, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for OFFICER JOHN/JANE DOE in accordance with #22 Summons returned executed served 6/22/2021: Answer due by 7/13/2021. (clp)
July 2, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LIBBY HEWES. OFFICER JOHN/JANE DOE served on 6/22/2021. (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 7/2/2021 to correct date served as indicated on document (clp).
June 30, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by J. WILLIAM DRUARY, JR on behalf of PATRICK HEALY (DRUARY, J.)
June 30, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by J. WILLIAM DRUARY, JR on behalf of HEALY CHIROPRACTIC LLC (DRUARY, J.)
June 30, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN L. MURPHY on behalf of PATRICK HEALY (MURPHY, ERIN)
June 30, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN L. MURPHY on behalf of HEALY CHIROPRACTIC LLC (MURPHY, ERIN)
June 29, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by SARA P. CRESSEY on behalf of BREWER SCHOOL SYSTEM, SAMANTHA PANGBURN, MORGAN SMALL (CRESSEY, SARA)
June 28, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for HEALY CHIROPRACTIC LLC in accordance with ECF #16 Waiver of Service Executed sent 6/18/2021: Answer due by 8/17/2021. (clp)
June 28, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for PATRICK HEALY in accordance with ECF #15 Waiver of Service Executed sent 6/18/2021: Answer due by 8/17/2021. (clp)
June 28, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for PHILLIP PUSHARD in accordance with ECF #14 Waiver of Service Executed sent 6/18/2021: Answer due by 8/17/2021. (clp)
June 28, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for MATTHEW PUSHARD in accordance with ECF #13 Waiver of Service Executed sent 6/18/2021: Answer due by 8/17/2021. (clp)
June 28, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for JACQUELINE PUSHARD in accordance with ECF #12 Waiver of Service Executed sent 6/18/2021: Answer due by 8/17/2021. (clp)
June 28, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for GRETCHEN GARDINER in accordance with ECF #11 Waiver of Service Executed sent 6/18/2021: Answer due by 8/17/2021. (clp)
June 28, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for SAMANTHA PANGBURN in accordance with ECF #10 Waiver of Service Executed sent 6/18/2021: Answer due by 8/17/2021. (clp)
June 28, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for BREWER SCHOOL SYSTEM in accordance with ECF #9 Waiver of Service Executed sent 6/18/2021: Answer due by 8/17/2021. (clp)
June 28, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for GREGG PALMER in accordance with ECF #8 Waiver of Service Executed sent 6/18/2021: Answer due by 8/17/2021. (clp)
June 28, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for MORGAN SMALL in accordance with ECF #7 Waiver of Service Executed sent 6/18/2021: Answer due by 8/17/2021. (clp)
June 28, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed HEALY CHIROPRACTIC LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2021. (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correctly reflect the date sent of 6/18/2021 as indicated on waiver (clp).
June 28, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed PATRICK HEALY waiver sent on 6/18/2021. (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correctly reflect the date sent of 6/18/2021 as indicated on waiver (clp).
June 28, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed PHILLIP PUSHARD waiver sent on 6/18/2021. (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correctly reflect the date sent of 6/18/2021 as indicated on waiver (clp).
June 28, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed MATTHEW PUSHARD waiver sent on 6/18/2021. (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correctly reflect the date sent of 6/18/2021 as indicated on waiver (clp).
June 28, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed JACQUELINE PUSHARD waiver sent on 6/18/2021. (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correctly reflect the date sent of 6/18/2021 as indicated on waiver (clp).
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed GRETCHEN GARDINER waiver sent on 6/18/2021. (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correctly reflect the date sent of 6/18/2021 as indicated on waiver (clp).
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed SAMANTHA PANGBURN waiver sent on 6/18/2021. (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correctly reflect the date sent of 6/18/2021 as indicated on waiver (clp).
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed BREWER SCHOOL SYSTEM waiver sent on 6/18/2021. (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correctly reflect the date sent of 6/18/2021 as indicated on waiver (clp).
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed GREGG PALMER waiver sent on 6/18/2021. (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correctly reflect the date sent of 6/18/2021 as indicated on waiver (clp).
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed MORGAN SMALL waiver sent on 6/18/2021. (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correct name of party waiving service of summons to MORGAN SMALL and date sent as correctly reflected on document (clp).
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by LIBBY HEWES re #4 Amended Complaint Amended Complaint Attachment 1.. (WILLEY, N.)
June 18, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: Main Attachment Summons Benjamin Pushard #1 Summons Officer John/Jane Doe, #2 Summons Patrick Healy, #3 Summons Jacqueline Pushard, #4 Summons Brewer School Department, #5 Summons Samantha Pangburn, #6 Summons Gregg Palmer, #7 Summons Gretchen Gardner, #8 Summons Morgan Small, #9 Summons Phillip Pushard, #10 Summons Matthew Pushard, #11 Summons Healy Chiropractic)(clp) Modified on 6/18/2021 to clean up text (clp).
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LIBBY HEWES. (Service of Process Deadline 9/16/2021)(WILLEY, N.)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA A. HEWEY on behalf of BREWER SCHOOL SYSTEM, SAMANTHA PANGBURN, MORGAN SMALL (HEWEY, MELISSA)
May 11, 2021 Filing Fee Received from LIBBY HEWES: Amount Paid: 402.00. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2490348. Method of Payment: Credit Card through Pay.gov. Purpose of Payment: Case Opening Filing Fee. Date Paid: 5/11/2021 (clp) Modified on 5/13/2021 to correct filing date to 5/11/20201(clp).
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by LIBBY HEWES against BREWER SCHOOL SYSTEM, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, PATRICK HEALY, HEALY CHIROPRACTIC LLC, SAMANTHA PANGBURN, BENJAMIN PUSHARD, JACKIE PUSHARD, MATTHEW PUSHARD, PHIL PUSHARD, MORGAN SMALL with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 8/9/2021) Fee due by 5/12/2021.(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEWES v. PUSHARD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKIE PUSHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN PUSHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BREWER SCHOOL SYSTEM
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: SARA P. CRESSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHIL PUSHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALY CHIROPRACTIC LLC
Represented By: ERIN L. MURPHY
Represented By: J. WILLIAM DRUARY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW PUSHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMANTHA PANGBURN
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: SARA P. CRESSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORGAN SMALL
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: SARA P. CRESSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK HEALY
Represented By: ERIN L. MURPHY
Represented By: J. WILLIAM DRUARY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELINE PUSHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP PUSHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JOHN/JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGG PALMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRETCHEN GARDINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIBBY HEWES
Represented By: EZRA A.R. WILLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?