BEACH v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: JENNY BEACH
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv00143
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER - Per Affidavit of Service #6: Answer due by 8/13/2021. (mnd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JENNY BEACH. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER served on 6/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Receipts, #2 Proof of Delivery)(FENNER, RILEY)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 United States Attorney summons, #2 Attorney General summons)(bfa)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JENNY BEACH (bfa)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by JENNY BEACH. (Service of Process Deadline 8/30/2021)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEACH v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNY BEACH
Represented By: RILEY L. FENNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?