PRESCOTT v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: PATRICIA FOUNTAIN PRESCOTT
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv00210
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PATRICIA FOUNTAIN PRESCOTT. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER served on 8/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail - AG, #2 Exhibit Certified Mail - ORCC, #3 Exhibit Certified Mail - USA)(JACKSON, FRANCIS)
September 9, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER: Answer due by 10/8/2021. (tcs)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD W. MAKAWA on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (MAKAWA, RONALD)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region I, #2 Summons Issued as to US Attorney)(tcs)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PATRICIA FOUNTAIN PRESCOTT (tcs)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (tcs)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by PATRICIA FOUNTAIN PRESCOTT. (Service of Process Deadline 10/28/2021)(tcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRESCOTT v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA FOUNTAIN PRESCOTT
Represented By: FRANCIS JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Represented By: RONALD W. MAKAWA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?