SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC v. LEUNG et al
Plaintiff: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC
Defendant: CHIU KIN LEUNG, VANESSA I CAYFORD, CHI KIN LEUNG and VANESSA GARIEPY
Case Number: 1:2021cv00218
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Set Deadlines: No answer or responsive pleading received from VANESSA I CAYFORD: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 10/14/2021. (slg)
August 26, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for VANESSA I CAYFORD per return of summons ECF No. 5: Answer due by 9/13/2021. (slg)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC. VANESSA I CAYFORD served on 8/23/2021. (KENNEDY, WILLIAM)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CHIU KIN LEUNG & VANESSA I CAYFORD. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). First Attached Document: Leung Summons (Attachments: #1 Cayford Summons)(mnd)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC. (mnd)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mnd)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHIU KIN LEUNG & VANESSA I CAYFORD filed by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 11/3/2021) Fee due by 8/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Magee Deed, #3 Exhibit 3 - Leung Deed, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mortgage, #5 Exhibit 5 - Assignment)(mnd)
August 5, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2531075.), filed by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC.(KENNEDY, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC v. LEUNG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIU KIN LEUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANESSA I CAYFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHI KIN LEUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANESSA GARIEPY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC
Represented By: WILLIAM KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?