MANTER v. UNITED STATES
Plaintiff: LLEWELLYN C MANTER
Defendant: SETH A MCLEAN-WILLIAMS, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE and UNITED STATES
Case Number: 1:2022cv00030
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 39 U.S.C. ยง 409 Postal Service
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Filing 83 STIPULATION re #63 Stipulation , Amending and Superseding Prior Version by UNITED STATES. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
August 21, 2023 Filing 82 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: Bench Trial scheduled to begin 11/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Portland Courtroom 1 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. Two days have been set aside for trial (11/16/2023-11/17/2023). Trial will go 8:30 a.m. to 2:45 p.m. with one 15-minute break in the morning and 30 minutes for lunch.(clp)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REVISED PRETRIAL ORDER Estimated length of trial 2 days Bench Trial set for 11/14-15/2023 08:30 AM in Portland Courtroom 1 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (jwr)
August 3, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial scheduled to begin 11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Portland Courtroom 1 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. Two days have been set aside for trial. Trial will go 8:30 a.m. to 2:45 p.m. with one 15-minute break in the morning and 30 minutes for lunch.(clp)
August 3, 2023 Filing 79 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE JON D. LEVY: Status Conference held on 8/3/2023. Case to be placed on November Civil Trial list per agreement of the parties. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (clp)
August 3, 2023 Set Deadlines : Ready for Trial on 11/6/2023. (clp)
July 20, 2023 Filing 78 STATUS REPORT Witness Health Update by LLEWELLYN C MANTER. (KAGAN, DANIEL)
July 14, 2023 Set Deadlines per order no. 77: Status Report due by 7/19/2023. (clp)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #76 Motion to Continue By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
July 11, 2023 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION to Continue by LLEWELLYN C MANTER Responses due by 8/1/2023. (KAGAN, DANIEL)
July 11, 2023 Filing 75 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2023 at 10:00 AM via telephone before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. The parties have been previously provided the Court's call in access information. (clp)
June 22, 2023 Filing 74 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Oral Argument held on 6/7/23 before Judge Jon D. Levy. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lori Dunbar, Telephone Number: (207) 749-4072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2023. (DUNBAR, LORI)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER-It is ORDERED that the Government's Motion in Limine (ECF No. 52) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART for reasons stated on the record of the hearing held on June 7, 2023. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Objection to Deposition Designations (ECF No. 59) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART for reasons stated on the record of the hearing held on June 7, 2023, as to the admission of the Plaintiffs two deposition transcripts and medical records attached as exhibits. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
June 7, 2023 Filing 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE JON D. LEVY: Oral Argument held re #52 MOTION in Limine to Admit Certain of Plaintiff's Medical Records filed by UNITED STATES, #59 First OBJECTION to #51 Deposition Designation for use at Trial filed by LLEWELLYN C MANTER. (Court Reporter: Lori Dunbar) (clp)
June 6, 2023 Filing 71 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING- The previously scheduled Bench Trial set to begin 6/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Portland Courtroom 3 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY has been cancelled per order no. 70. (clp)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Continue Bench Trial By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
June 6, 2023 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial by LLEWELLYN C MANTER Responses due by 6/27/2023. (KAGAN, DANIEL)
June 6, 2023 Set Deadlines per order no. 70: Status Report re availability for trial due by 7/6/2023. (clp)
May 30, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Plaintiff's Witnesses Testifying Remotely Via Zoom by UNITED STATES (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
May 30, 2023 Filing 67 NOTICE of Hearing: NOTICE of **UPDATED** Hearing **COURTROOM LOCATION CHANGE ONLY**: Bench Trial scheduled to begin 6/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Portland Courtroom 3 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. Two days have been set aside for trial. Trial will go 8:30 a.m. to 2:45 p.m. with one 15-minute break in the morning and 30 minutes for lunch. (clp)
May 30, 2023 Filing 66 NOTICE of **UPDATED** Hearing **COURTROOM LOCATION CHANGE ONLY**: Bench Trial scheduled to begin 6/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Portland Courtroom 1 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. Two days have been set aside for trial. Trial will go 8:30 a.m. to 2:45 p.m. with one 15-minute break in the morning and 30 minutes for lunch. (clp)
May 26, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #52 MOTION in Limine to Admit Certain of Plaintiff's Medical Records : Oral Argument set for 6/7/2023 at 02:00 PM in Portland Courtroom 1 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
May 17, 2023 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 MOTION in Limine to Admit Certain of Plaintiff's Medical Records and Request for Oral Argument filed by UNITED STATES. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
May 16, 2023 Filing 63 STIPULATION re #57 Stipulation , Amending and Superseding Prior Version by UNITED STATES. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
May 16, 2023 Filing 62 Exhibit List (Consolidated) by UNITED STATES.. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
May 16, 2023 Filing 61 Witness List by UNITED STATES . (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
May 15, 2023 Filing 60 Witness List by LLEWELLYN C MANTER Trial. (KAGAN, DANIEL)
May 15, 2023 Filing 59 First OBJECTION to #51 Deposition Designation for use at Trial filed by LLEWELLYN C MANTER. Responses due by 5/30/2023. (KAGAN, DANIEL)
May 15, 2023 Filing 58 RESPONSE to Motion re #52 MOTION in Limine to Admit Certain of Plaintiff's Medical Records Opposition filed by LLEWELLYN C MANTER. Reply due by 5/30/2023. (KAGAN, DANIEL)
May 15, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #52 MOTION in Limine to Admit Certain of Plaintiff's Medical Records per directive of Chief U.S. District Judge Jon D. Levy: Reply due by 5/17/2023. (clp)
May 10, 2023 Filing 57 STIPULATION by LLEWELLYN C MANTER. (KAGAN, DANIEL)
May 9, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #52 MOTION in Limine to Admit Certain of Plaintiff's Medical Records per order no 56: Responses due by 5/15/2023. (clp)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Extend Time MIL to Admit Certain Plaintiffs Medical records By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
May 5, 2023 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time MIL to Admit Certain Plaintiffs Medical records by LLEWELLYN C MANTER Responses due by 5/26/2023. (KAGAN, DANIEL)
May 2, 2023 Filing 54 DEPOSITION DESIGNATION of LLEWELLYN C. MANTER (Re-Opened) by UNITED STATES. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
May 2, 2023 Filing 53 DEPOSITION of LLEWELLYN C. MANTER (Re-Opened) taken on Apr. 26, 2023 filed by UNITED STATES. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
May 1, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION in Limine to Admit Certain of Plaintiff's Medical Records by UNITED STATES Responses due by 5/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Def.'s R. 26(a)(2)(C) Expert Disclosures (Sept. 6, 2022), #2 Rep. of Dr. Kendra Bryant (undated - excerpted), #3 Rep. & Update of Dr. Kendra Bryant (Apr. 10, 2023), #4 U.S. Ex. 27, 2021.2.25, Dr. Gray Online Visit Office Note [CAG 17], #5 U.S. Ex. 30, 2021.9.29, Dr. Cheng Office Visit Note [CHA 103-108], #6 807(b) Notice Letter (Feb. 6, 2023))(LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
May 1, 2023 Filing 51 DEPOSITION DESIGNATION of LLEWELLYN C. MANTER (Sept. 28, 2022) by UNITED STATES. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
May 1, 2023 Filing 50 DEPOSITION of LLEWELLYN C. MANTER taken on Sept. 28, 2022 filed by UNITED STATES. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
May 1, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #52 MOTION in Limine to Admit Certain of Plaintiff's Medical Records per order no. 45: Responses due by 5/8/2023. (clp)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Enlarge MIL Page Limit to 15-Pages (LR 7(d)) By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
April 24, 2023 Filing 48 Consent MOTION to Enlarge MIL Page Limit to 15-Pages (LR 7(d)) by UNITED STATES Responses due by 5/15/2023. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
April 10, 2023 Filing 47 TRIAL LIST: On Trial List for 6/6/2023. (jgd)
February 23, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: Bench Trial scheduled to begin 6/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Portland Courtroom 2 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. Two days have been set aside for trial. Trial will go 8:30 a.m. to 2:45 p.m. with one 15-minute break in the morning and 30 minutes for lunch. Counsel should review Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols, Social Distancing and Testing.(clp)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CONSENT ORDER granting 44 Motion to Continue Trial By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (tcs)
February 21, 2023 Filing 44 Oral MOTION to Continue Trial by UNITED STATES (tcs)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Oral ORDER granting without objection 42 Motion to Permit Video Testimony of Expert Witness By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (tcs)
February 21, 2023 Filing 42 Oral MOTION to Permit Video Testimony of Expert Witness by LLEWELLYN C MANTER (tcs)
February 21, 2023 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE JON D. LEVY: Trial Management Conference held. Government's Proposed Order due by 12:00p.m. on 2/24/2023. (Court Reporter: Lori Dunbar) (tcs)
February 21, 2023 Reset Deadlines per Consent Order issued on February 21, 2023: Motion in Limine due by 5/1/2023. Responses due by 5/8/2023. Stipulated Record due by 5/10/2023. Witness Lists due by 5/15/2023. Consolidated Exhibit List due by 5/15/2023. Parties to Inform Clerk's Office if matter has settled or is firm for trial by 5/30/2023. Ready for Trial on 6/6/2023. (tcs)
February 6, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Hearing: Trial Management Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 10:00 AM via ZOOM VIDEO HEARING before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. The parties have been previously provided the Court's ZOOM connection information.(clp)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Consent Motion for Trial Management Conference and Extension of Motion in Limine Deadlines By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
February 6, 2023 Reset Deadlines per order no. 39: Motions in Limine due by 2/24/2023. (clp)
February 2, 2023 Filing 38 Consent MOTION for Trial Management Conference and Extension of Motion in Limine Deadlines by UNITED STATES Responses due by 2/23/2023. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
January 26, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by KATELYN SANER on behalf of UNITED STATES (SANER, KATELYN) Modified on 1/27/2023 to remove terminated defendant (clp).
January 23, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Plaintiff's Consent to Portland Trial Venue by LLEWELLYN C MANTER (KAGAN, DANIEL) Modified on 1/23/2023 to clean up text (clp).
January 23, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: United States' Consent to Portland Trial Venue by UNITED STATES (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPORT OF FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER- Set Deadlines:(Consent to location change due by 1/24/2023; Motions in Limine due by 2/10/2023; Stipulations due by 3/8/2023; Depositions due by 3/10/2023., Objections to Depositions (via motion) due by 3/15/2023; Notice of Settlement (if applicable) due by 3/15/2023; Witness Lists and CONSOLIDATED Exhibit List due by 3/15/2023.) By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
January 17, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of *RESCHEDULED* Hearing: Bench Trial set to begin for 3/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Portland Courtroom 2 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. Two days have been set aside for trial. Trial will go 8:30 a.m. to 2:45 p.m. with one 15-minute break in the morning and 30 minutes for lunch. Counsel should review Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols, Social Distancing and Testing.(clp)
January 13, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set to begin for 3/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Bangor Courtroom 2 before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. Two days have been set aside for trial. Trial will go 8:30 a.m. to 2:45 p.m. with one 15-minute break in the morning and 30 minutes for lunch. Counsel should review Amended General Order 2021-6 regarding Masks, Courthouse Entrance Protocols, Social Distancing and Testing.(clp)
January 13, 2023 Filing 31 TRIAL LIST:. On Trial List for 3/7/2023.(clp)
January 13, 2023 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE JON D. LEVY: Final Pretrial Conference held. Trial Continued to March for the reasons stated on the record. Order to enter. (Court Reporter: Lori Dunbar) (clp)
January 12, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL G. KAGAN on behalf of LLEWELLYN C MANTER (KAGAN, DANIEL)
January 9, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Rescheduled Video Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2023 03:00 PM before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (jwr)
January 9, 2023 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Settlement Conference held. Settlement negotiations ongoing. (Court Reporter: No court reporter present) (jwr)
January 4, 2023 Filing 26 FINAL PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by LLEWELLYN C MANTER. (KAGAN, DANIEL)
December 30, 2022 Filing 25 FINAL PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by UNITED STATES. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Protection from Trial for Protection from Trial for dates of 2/1/23-2/17/23 - By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (mnd)
December 20, 2022 Filing 23 First MOTION for Protection from Trial for dates of 2/1/23-2/17/23 by LLEWELLYN C MANTER Responses due by 1/10/2023. (KAGAN, DANIEL)
December 16, 2022 Filing 22 Witness List by LLEWELLYN C MANTER . (KAGAN, DANIEL)
December 16, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED VIDEO HEARING: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2023 rescheduled to begin at 11:30 AM before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. Counsel have been provided with the video connection information. (mnd)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Continue Start Time of Pretrial Conference to 11:30am - By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (mnd)
December 15, 2022 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Continue Start Time of Pretrial Conference to 11:30am by UNITED STATES Responses due by 1/5/2023. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
December 12, 2022 Filing 18 TRIAL LIST:. On Trial List for 2/7/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2023 11:00 AM by video before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. Final Pretrial Memo due by 1/4/2023.(lrt)
December 1, 2022 Set Deadlines in accordance with Order no. 15: Ready for Trial on 2/7/2023. (clp)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Video Settlement Conference for 1/9/2023 at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. In Camera Settlement Papers due by 1/3/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
November 22, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of CANCELLED HEARING: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2022 at 11:00 AM in VIDEO HEARING before JUDGE JON D. LEVY has been cancelled. (clp)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Continue Trial By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
November 22, 2022 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Continue Trial to February 2023 Trial Calendar by UNITED STATES Responses due by 12/13/2022. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
November 10, 2022 Filing 13 TRIAL LIST: On Trial List for 1/3/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2022 11:00 AM in VIDEO HEARING before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. Final Pretrial Memo due by 11/29/2022.(slg)
November 7, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2022 at 11:00 AM via Zoom Video Hearing before JUDGE JON D. LEVY. Final Pretrial Memo due by 11/29/2022. The parties have been previously provided the Court's Zoom video hearing access information. (clp)
May 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Drop Party. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 27, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Drop Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 by UNITED STATES Responses due by 6/17/2022. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/11/2022. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/18/2022. Motions due by 11/1/2022. Ready for Trial on 1/3/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
May 20, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES.(LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
May 20, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: U.S. Attorney Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2679(d)(1) by UNITED STATES (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
April 20, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for UNITED STATES in accordance with ECF No. 6 Affidavit of Service filed served 3/25/2022: Answer due by 5/24/2022. (clp)
April 19, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by LLEWELLYN C MANTER. UNITED STATES served on 4/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attachment 1 - Proof of Service on the Attorney General, #2 Affidavit Attachment 2 - Proof of Service on the U.S. Attorney for the District of Maine)(KAGAN, DANIEL)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (clp)
March 17, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SETH A MCLEAN-WILLIAMS, UNITED STATES, filed by LLEWELLYN C MANTER. (Service of Process Deadline 6/15/2022)(KAGAN, DANIEL)
February 7, 2022 Filing Fee Received from LLEWELLYN C MANTER: Amount Paid: 402.00. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2612340. Method of Payment: Credit Card through Pay.gov. Purpose of Payment: Case Opening Filing Fee. Date Paid: 2/3/2022 (clp)
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SETH A MCLEAN-WILLIAMS, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Seth A. Mclean-Williams summons)(bfa)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SETH A MCLEAN-WILLIAMS, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LLEWELLYN C MANTER. (Service of Process Deadline 5/3/2022) Fee due by 2/4/2022.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANTER v. UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LLEWELLYN C MANTER
Represented By: ALICIA F. CURTIS
Represented By: DANIEL G. KAGAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. BOOTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETH A MCLEAN-WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Represented By: ANDREW K. LIZOTTE
Represented By: KATELYN SANER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?