KW BOATS et al v. ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY INC
Plaintiff: KW BOATS, KENWAY CORP, KENNETH PRIEST, SUSAN PRIEST, MICHAEL PRIEST, TERRIE PRIEST and IAN KOPP
Defendant: ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY INC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00088
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on 5/19/2022 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 6/21/2022. By DEPUTY CLERK: Lindsey Tully. (lrt)
April 25, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KW BOATS. (ECHEVERRIA, ASHA)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (tcs)
April 20, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint by ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY INC Responses due by 5/11/2022. (WALL, JOHN)
April 20, 2022 Reset Answer Deadline for ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY INC: Answer due by 5/20/2022. (tcs)
April 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHA ANN ECHEVERRIA on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ECHEVERRIA, ASHA)
April 19, 2022 Set Deadlines as to KW BOATS: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/26/2022. (tcs)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY INC. (KNOWLES, ALLYSON)
April 13, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY INC per Order entered in State Court: Answer due by 4/20/2022. (lrt)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Attested Docket Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pls' Mot to Enlarge Time to File Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - ORDG Pls' Mot to Enlarge Time to File Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit 5 - Pls' Mot to Enlarge Time to File Proof of Service, #6 Exhibit 6 - ORDG Pls' Mot to Enlarge Time to File Proof of Service, #7 Exhibit 7 - Pls' Mot to Enlarge Time to File Proof of Service, #8 Exhibit 8 - Def's Mot to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint, #9 Exhibit 9 - ORDG Pls' Mot to Enlarge Time to File Proof of Service, #10 Exhibit 10 - ORDG Def's Mot to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint)(KNOWLES, ALLYSON)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 4/15/2022. By DEPUTY CLERK: Charity Pelletier. (clp)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings Complaint from Kennebec County Superior Court, case number AUGS-CV-2021-165. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY INC. (Service of Process Deadline 7/7/2022) Fee due by 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint)(clp)
April 8, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2639233.), filed by ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY INC.(KNOWLES, ALLYSON)
April 8, 2022 Set Deadlines as to ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY INC: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/15/2022. (clp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KW BOATS et al v. ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KW BOATS
Represented By: ASHA ANN ECHEVERRIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENWAY CORP
Represented By: ASHA ANN ECHEVERRIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH PRIEST
Represented By: ASHA ANN ECHEVERRIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN PRIEST
Represented By: ASHA ANN ECHEVERRIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL PRIEST
Represented By: ASHA ANN ECHEVERRIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRIE PRIEST
Represented By: ASHA ANN ECHEVERRIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAN KOPP
Represented By: ASHA ANN ECHEVERRIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY INC
Represented By: ALLYSON L. KNOWLES
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?