DAVIS et al v. THERIAULT et al
Plaintiff: HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR and CRAIG WORSTER
Defendant: JANET THERIAULT, STEVEN GOLIEB, MICHAEL MADORE, LOUISE PELLETIER, RANDY JACKSON, ANNETTE PADILLA, TOWN OF MILLINOCKET, SUSAN D'ALESSANDRO, JENNIFER MURRAY STANLEY, MICHAEL CUNNIFF, ESQ, TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION 340, BRETT MILLER, LORNE SMITH, WISCASSET POLICE DEPARTMENT, JEFFREY LANGE, ANDREW WRIGHT, ESQ, NATASHA IRVING, DA STEPHEN BROWN, RIDGEFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT, LOUIS PELLETIER, NATASHA IRVING, DA and STEPHEN BROWN
Case Number: 1:2022cv00275
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
2 Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by JENNIFER MURRAY STANLEY Responses due by 11/18/2022. (HARRIMAN, ALEXANDRA)
October 28, 2022 Filing 79 MOTION to Extend Time to 11/18/2022 to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by ANNETTE PADILLA by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR, CRAIG WORSTER Responses due by 11/18/2022. (WILLEY, EZRA) Modified on 10/28/2022 to clarify docket text (jwr).
October 27, 2022 Filing 78 MOTION to Strike #55 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 14 M.R.S. 556 by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR, CRAIG WORSTER Responses due by 11/17/2022. (WILLEY, EZRA)
October 27, 2022 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 14 M.R.S. 556 filed by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR, CRAIG WORSTER. Reply due by 11/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(WILLEY, EZRA)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #75 Motion to Extend Time. Time to file response to Defendant Cunniff's dispositive motion is extended to November 3, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 27, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #55 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 14 M.R.S. 556, #54 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim per Order #76: Responses due by 11/3/2022. (mmy)
October 26, 2022 Filing 75 MOTION to Extend Time 7-days by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR, CRAIG WORSTER Responses due by 11/16/2022. (WILLEY, EZRA)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to JEFFREY LANGE By DEPUTY CLERK: M. York (mmy)
October 25, 2022 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss by ANDREW WRIGHT, ESQ Responses due by 11/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fuller Docket Record, #2 Exhibit B - Motion & Order for Protection, #3 Exhibit C - BDN Article)(STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
October 25, 2022 Filing 72 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR, CRAIG WORSTER Responses due by 11/15/2022. (WILLEY, EZRA)
October 25, 2022 Filing 71 MOTION for Entry of Default by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR, CRAIG WORSTER Responses due by 11/15/2022. (WILLEY, EZRA)
October 25, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #69 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jeffrey Lange: This docket entry was modified to indicate filed in error. Counsel to refile motion at Clerk's Office request. (mmy)
October 25, 2022 Filing 69 **FILED IN ERROR** MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jeffrey Lange by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR, CRAIG WORSTER Responses due by 11/15/2022. (WILLEY, EZRA) Modified on 10/25/2022 counsel to refile at Clerk's Office Request. (mmy).
October 25, 2022 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to JEFFREY LANGE on 11/28/2022. (mmy)
October 21, 2022 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NATASHA IRVING, DA. (SUITTER, PAUL)
October 21, 2022 Filing 67 MAIL (ECF No. 49) sent to GABRIEL O. DUMONT, JR. returned as undeliverable. Reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED. (tcs)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 64 Motion to Extend Time to Complete and File Proof of Service. Time is extended to December 5, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER terminating #60 Order to Show Cause. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 20, 2022 Reset Deadlines per Order #66: Service of Process Deadline 12/5/2022 (mmy)
October 19, 2022 Filing 64 MOTION to Extend Time 45-Days to Effectuate Service (No PDF attached. See Pleading #63 ) by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR, CRAIG WORSTER (mmy)
October 19, 2022 Filing 63 RESPONSE TO #60 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR, CRAIG WORSTER. (WILLEY, EZRA)
October 19, 2022 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR, CRAIG WORSTER. Reply due by 11/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(WILLEY, EZRA)
October 18, 2022 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR, CRAIG WORSTER. Reply due by 11/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(WILLEY, EZRA)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/1/2022. By DEPUTY CLERK: M. York (mmy)
October 18, 2022 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR. JEFFREY LANGE served on 9/30/2022 (WILLEY, EZRA) Modified on 10/18/2022 to include name of party served and date served (mmy).
October 18, 2022 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for JEFFREY LANGE: Answer due by 10/21/2022. (mmy)
October 17, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss by JANET THERIAULT Responses due by 11/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LOUISON, DOUGLAS)
October 17, 2022 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to 14 M.R.S. 556 with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by ANNETTE PADILLA Responses due by 11/7/2022. (WALL, JOHN)
October 12, 2022 Filing 56 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by STEVEN GOLIEB, RANDY JACKSON, MICHAEL MADORE, ANNETTE PADILLA, LOUIS PELLETIER, TOWN OF MILLINOCKET.(WALL, JOHN)
October 6, 2022 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 14 M.R.S. 556 by MICHAEL CUNNIFF, ESQ Responses due by 10/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Cunniff, #2 Exhibit Cunniff Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Cunniff Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Cunniff Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Cunniff Exhibit 5)(WAHRER, BENJAMIN) Modified on 10/6/2022 to remove duplicate affidavit text (mmy).
October 6, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by MICHAEL CUNNIFF, ESQ Responses due by 10/27/2022. (WAHRER, BENJAMIN)
October 6, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint per Order #52 and #53: Responses due by 10/19/2022. (mmy)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Time is extended to October 19, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Time is extended to October 19, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 5, 2022 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to 10/19/2022 by CRAIG WORSTER, HAROLD JOHN DAVIS JR Responses due by 10/26/2022. (WILLEY, EZRA) Modified on 10/5/2022 to add Harold John Davis, Jr. as a filing party (mmy).
October 5, 2022 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to 10/19/2022 by CRAIG WORSTER, HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR Responses due by 10/26/2022. (WILLEY, EZRA) Modified on 10/5/2022 to add Harold John Davis, Jr. as an additional filer (mmy).
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Extend Time to File Signed Affidavit. The signed affidavit is accepted for filing. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 5, 2022 Filing 48 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR re #45 Response in Opposition to Motion, . Main Document: Exhibit B Affidavit of Harold John Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Davis Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 to Davis Affidavit)(WILLEY, EZRA) Modified on 10/5/2022 to clean up attachment docket text (mmy).
September 27, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #45 Response in Opposition to Motion, #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Signed Affidavit of Harold "John" Davis, Jr.: ECF #45 and #46 were modified to remove duplicative exhibit text. ECF #46 has been modified to correct event used from "Miscellaneous Motion" to "Motion for Extension of Time." (mmy)
September 26, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Signed Affidavit of Harold "John" Davis, Jr. by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR Responses due by 10/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Harold John Davis, Jr., #2 Exhibit 1 Code of Town of Millinocket, #3 Exhibit 2 Personnel Policy)(WILLEY, N.) Modified on 9/27/2022 to correct filing from a Miscellaneous Motion 1 as filed, to a Motion to Extend Time, and remove duplicative exhibit text (mmy).
September 26, 2022 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CRAIG WORSTER. Reply due by 10/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Agreement Exhibit A.1, #2 Agreement Exhibit A.2, #3 Affidavit of Craig Worster Exhibit C) (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 9/27/2022 to remove duplicative exhibit text (mmy).
September 23, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA A. MAHER on behalf of STEVEN GOLIEB, RANDY JACKSON, MICHAEL MADORE, ANNETTE PADILLA, LOUIS PELLETIER, TOWN OF MILLINOCKET (MAHER, LAURA)
September 22, 2022 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by STEVEN GOLIEB, RANDY JACKSON, MICHAEL MADORE, ANNETTE PADILLA, LOUIS PELLETIER, TOWN OF MILLINOCKET.(WALL, JOHN)
September 22, 2022 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint by ANDREW WRIGHT, ESQ.(STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
September 22, 2022 Filing 41 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by MICHAEL CUNNIFF, ESQ.(WAHRER, BENJAMIN)
September 22, 2022 Filing 40 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gabriel O. Dumont, Jr., Esq. filed by SAMUEL S. RIOTTE on behalf of BRETT MILLER, LORNE SMITH, TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION 340 The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (RIOTTE, SAMUEL)
September 22, 2022 Set Deadlines: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney GABRIEL O. DUMONT, JR. must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 9/30/2022. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (mmy)
September 21, 2022 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by NATASHA IRVING, DA Responses due by 10/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit March 2021 BDN Article)(SUITTER, PAUL)
September 21, 2022 Filing 38 **FILED IN ERROR** CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gabriel O. Dumont, Jr., Esq. filed by SAMUEL S. RIOTTE on behalf of BRETT MILLER, LORNE SMITH, TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION 340 (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2703408.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (RIOTTE, SAMUEL) Modified on 9/22/2022 to indicate filed in error. Unsigned certification attached, counsel refiled at ECF #40 (mmy).
September 21, 2022 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JANET THERIAULT.(PADOLSKY, JOSEPH)
September 21, 2022 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by WISCASSET POLICE DEPARTMENT. (PARK, KASIA)
September 21, 2022 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint by MICHAEL CUNNIFF, ESQ.(WAHRER, BENJAMIN)
September 21, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by JENNIFER MURRAY STANLEY Responses due by 10/12/2022. (HARRIMAN, ALEXANDRA)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. Time is extended to September 22, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 21, 2022 Reset Answer Deadline for ANDREW WRIGHT, ESQ per Order #33: Answer due by 9/22/2022. (mmy)
September 20, 2022 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by ANDREW WRIGHT, ESQ Responses due by 10/11/2022. (STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
September 20, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH G. STOUDER on behalf of ANDREW WRIGHT, ESQ (STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
September 20, 2022 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to ANDREW WRIGHT, ESQ on 10/20/2022. (mmy)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Extend Time to Complete and File Proof of Service. Time is extended to October 17, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 16, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION to Extend Time to Effect Service Upon Defendants Smith, Lange, Wright, Brown and the Ridgefield Police Department filed by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR, CRAIG WORSTER in State Court on 8/26/2022. (mmy)
September 16, 2022 Filing 28 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by STEVEN GOLIEB, RANDY JACKSON, MICHAEL MADORE, ANNETTE PADILLA, LOUIS PELLETIER, TOWN OF MILLINOCKET. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Attested Docket Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Executed Civil Summons for Defendant Natasha Irving, #5 Exhibit 5 - Executed Civil Summons for Defendant Wiscasset Police Department, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Appearance for Defendant Janet Theriault, #7 Exhibit 7 - Defendant Wiscasset Police Departments Motion to Dismiss with Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #8 Exhibit 8 - Defendant Susan DAlessandros Answer, #9 Exhibit 9 - Executed Civil Summons for Defendant Jennifer Murray Stanley, #10 Exhibit 10 - Executed Civil Summons for Defendant Michael Cunniff, Esq., #11 Exhibit 11 - Executed Civil Summons for Defendant Susan DAlessandro, #12 Exhibit 12 - Entry of Appearance for Defendant Natasha Irving, #13 Exhibit 13 - Defendant Natasha Irvings Consented Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading, #14 Exhibit 14 - Acceptance of Service for Defendant Steven Golieb, #15 Exhibit 15 - Acceptance of Service for Defendant Michael Madore, #16 Exhibit 16 - Acceptance of Service for Defendant Louis Pelletier, #17 Exhibit 17 - Acceptance of Service for Defendant Randy Jackson, #18 Exhibit 18 - Acceptance of Service for Defendant Annette Padilla, #19 Exhibit 19 - Acceptance of Service for Defendant Town of Millinocket, #20 Exhibit 20 - Acceptance of Service for Defendants Teamster Local Union #340 and Brett Miller, #21 Exhibit 21 - Entry of Appearance of attorney Benjamin J. Wahrer for Defendant Michael Cunniff, Esq., #22 Exhibit 22 - Entry of Appearance of attorney James M. Bowie for Defendant Michael Cunniff, Esq., #23 Exhibit 23 - Entry of Appearance for Defendant Jennifer Murray Stanley, #24 Exhibit 24 - Defendant Jennifer Murray Stanleys Consented-To Motion to Enlarge Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Amended Complaint, #25 Exhibit 25 - Plaintiffs Motion for Enlargement of Time to Effect Service upon Defendants Smith, Lange, Wright, Brown and the Ridgefield Police Department, #26 Exhibit 26 - Defendant Michael Cunniff, Esq.s Consented to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading, #27 Exhibit 27 - Entry of Appearance of attorney Howard Reben for Defendants Teamsters Local Union #340 and Brett Miller, #28 Exhibit 28 - Entry of Appearance of attorney Samuel S. Riotte for Defendants Teamsters Local Union #340 and Brett Miller, #29 Exhibit 29 - Defendants Teamsters Local Union #340 and Brett Millers Motion for Admission of Visiting Counsel Pro Hac Vice, Pursuant to M.R.Civ.P. 89, #30 Exhibit 30 - Letter filed August 30, 2022 from attorney Samuel S. Riotte regarding admission of counsel Gabriel Dumont, Esq., Pro Hac Vice, #31 Exhibit 31 - Defendant Janet Theriaults Consented Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading, #32 Exhibit 32 - Entry of Appearance of attorney Howard Reben for Defendant Lorne Smith, #33 Exhibit 33 - Entry of Appearance of attorney Samuel S. Riotte for Defendant Lorne Smith)(WALL, JOHN)
September 16, 2022 Reset Deadlines per Order #30: (Service of Process Deadline 10/17/2022) (mmy)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to September 21, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to September 21, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to September 21, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 8, 2022 Reset Answer Deadline for MICHAEL CUNNIFF, ESQ, NATASHA IRVING, DA, AND JENNIFER MURRAY STANLEY per Order #25, 26, and 27: Answer due by 9/21/2022. (mmy)
September 7, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR. Reply due by 9/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(WILLEY, N.)
September 7, 2022 Filing 23 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by MICHAEL CUNNIFF, ESQ filed in State Court on 8/29/2022. (mmy)
September 7, 2022 Filing 22 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by JENNIFER MURRAY STANLEY filed in State Court on 8/26/2022. (mmy)
September 7, 2022 Filing 21 Consented MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by NATASHA IRVING, DA filed in State Court on 8/22/2022. (mmy)
September 7, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by WISCASSET POLICE DEPARTMENT filed in State Court on 8/19/2022. Responses due by 9/9/2022. (mmy)
September 7, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL E. SUITTER on behalf of NATASHA IRVING, DA (SUITTER, PAUL)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. Time is extended to September 22, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 7, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of JENNIFER MURRAY STANLEY (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
September 7, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer Amended Complaint by JANET THERIAULT Responses due by 9/28/2022. (LOUISON, DOUGLAS)
September 7, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDRA A. HARRIMAN on behalf of JENNIFER MURRAY STANLEY (HARRIMAN, ALEXANDRA)
September 7, 2022 Reset Answer Deadline per Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Amended Complaint for JANET THERIAULT: Answer due by 9/22/2022. (mmy)
September 6, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BRETT MILLER, LORNE SMITH, TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION 340 Responses due by 9/27/2022. (RIOTTE, SAMUEL)
September 6, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL S. RIOTTE on behalf of BRETT MILLER, LORNE SMITH, TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION 340 (RIOTTE, SAMUEL)
September 6, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH A. PADOLSKY on behalf of JANET THERIAULT (PADOLSKY, JOSEPH)
September 6, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS I. LOUISON on behalf of JANET THERIAULT (LOUISON, DOUGLAS)
September 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES M. BOWIE on behalf of MICHAEL CUNNIFF, ESQ (BOWIE, JAMES)
September 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by KASIA S. PARK on behalf of WISCASSET POLICE DEPARTMENT (PARK, KASIA)
September 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN WAHRER on behalf of MICHAEL CUNNIFF, ESQ (WAHRER, BENJAMIN)
September 2, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR. ANDREW WRIGHT, ESQ. served on 8/26/2022 (WILLEY, N.) Modified on 9/2/2022 to include name party served (jgd).
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER for all further proceedings By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (tcs)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. Time is extended to September 22, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 2, 2022 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by STEVEN GOLIEB, RANDY JACKSON, MICHAEL MADORE, ANNETTE PADILLA, LOUIS PELLETIER, TOWN OF MILLINOCKET Responses due by 9/23/2022. (WALL, JOHN)
September 2, 2022 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 9/16/2022. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
September 2, 2022 Answer Deadline for STEVEN GOLIEB, MICHAEL MADORE, LOUIS PELLETIER, RANDY JACKSON, ANNETTE PADILLA, TOWN OF MILLINOCKET : Answer due by 9/8/2022. (bfa)
September 2, 2022 Set Answer Deadline Regarding #7 Summons Returned Executed for ANDREW WRIGHT, ESQ.: Answer due by 9/16/2022. (jgd)
September 2, 2022 Reset Answer Deadline for STEVEN GOLIEB, RANDY JACKSON, MICHAEL MADORE, ANNETTE PADILLA, LOUIS PELLETIER, TOWN OF MILLINOCKET: Answers due by 9/22/2022. (tcs)
September 2, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2696001.), filed by MICHAEL MADORE, ANNETTE PADILLA, TOWN OF MILLINOCKET, LOUIS PELLETIER, STEVEN GOLIEB, RANDY JACKSON.(WALL, JOHN)
September 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - list of defendants and counsel)(bfa)
September 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Penobscot County Superior Court, case number CV-2022-069. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MICHAEL MADORE, ANNETTE PADILLA, TOWN OF MILLINOCKET, LOUIS PELLETIER, STEVEN GOLIEB, RANDY JACKSON. (Service of Process Deadline 11/30/2022) Fee due by 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 amended complaint, #2 acceptances of service on Town Defendants)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS et al v. THERIAULT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD JOHN DAVIS, JR
Represented By: EZRA A.R. WILLEY
Represented By: N. LAURENCE WILLEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG WORSTER
Represented By: EZRA A.R. WILLEY
Represented By: N. LAURENCE WILLEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET THERIAULT
Represented By: DOUGLAS I. LOUISON
Represented By: JOSEPH A. PADOLSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN GOLIEB
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Represented By: LAURA A. MAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL MADORE
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Represented By: LAURA A. MAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUISE PELLETIER
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDY JACKSON
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Represented By: LAURA A. MAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNETTE PADILLA
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Represented By: LAURA A. MAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF MILLINOCKET
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Represented By: LAURA A. MAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN D'ALESSANDRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER MURRAY STANLEY
Represented By: ALEXANDRA A. HARRIMAN
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CUNNIFF, ESQ
Represented By: BENJAMIN WAHRER
Represented By: JAMES M. BOWIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION 340
Represented By: HOWARD T. REBEN
Represented By: GABRIEL O. DUMONT, JR.
Represented By: SAMUEL S. RIOTTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRETT MILLER
Represented By: HOWARD T. REBEN
Represented By: GABRIEL O. DUMONT, JR.
Represented By: SAMUEL S. RIOTTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORNE SMITH
Represented By: HOWARD T. REBEN
Represented By: GABRIEL O. DUMONT, JR.
Represented By: SAMUEL S. RIOTTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WISCASSET POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY LANGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW WRIGHT, ESQ
Represented By: ELIZABETH G. STOUDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATASHA IRVING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DA STEPHEN BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIDGEFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS PELLETIER
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Represented By: LAURA A. MAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATASHA IRVING, DA
Represented By: PAUL E. SUITTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?