LOGAN v. WASHINGTON COUNTY JAIL MEDICAL DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY LOGAN
Defendant: WASHINGTON COUNTY JAIL MEDICAL DEPARTMENT, NURSE CHELSEA, ALL NURSES, LT ALBEE, SGT ALBEE, CORPORAL NICOLE and NURSE KIM
Case Number: 1:2022cv00347
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #7 Report and Recommended Decision filed by ANTHONY LOGAN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 12/13/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER to the Prison Business Office from Clerks Office regarding collection of fees as to ANTHONY LOGAN. (clp)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INDICATION by Prisoner ANTHONY LOGAN of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(clp)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE: Recently ANTHONY LOGAN filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at #https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (clp)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 11/29/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 11/29/2022. (MFS)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by ANTHONY LOGAN (Attachments: #1 DOC Trust Account Statement)(clp) Modified on 11/4/2022 to correctly reflect filing date (clp).
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by ANTHONY LOGAN. (Service of Process Deadline 2/1/2023) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(clp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOGAN v. WASHINGTON COUNTY JAIL MEDICAL DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY LOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON COUNTY JAIL MEDICAL DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE CHELSEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL NURSES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT ALBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT ALBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPORAL NICOLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?