THURSTON v. PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MATTHEW THURSTON
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO
Case Number: 1:2022cv00375
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Compel Appraisal MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by MATTHEW THURSTON. Reply due by 2/8/2023. (STEED, JOHN)
December 28, 2022 Filing 17 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO. (MARJERISON, THOMAS)
December 28, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement : Docket entry modified by the Clerk's Office to indicate that it was filed in error and will be re-filed by counsel. (mnd)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Time 14 Days To Respond to Defendants' (Doc. 12) Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel Appraisal and Stay Proceedings - By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (mnd)
December 27, 2022 Filing 14 **FILED IN ERROR** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO. (MARJERISON, THOMAS) Modified on 12/28/2022 to add filed in error notation, counsel to re-file (mnd).
December 27, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Compel Appraisal and Stay the Proceedings - Per Order #15: Response due by 1/25/2023. (mnd)
December 24, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Extend Time 14 Days To Respond to Defendants' (Doc. 12) Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel Appraisal and Stay Proceedings by MATTHEW THURSTON Responses due by 1/17/2023. (STEED, JOHN)
December 21, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Compel Appraisal and Stay the Proceedings and Memorandum in Support by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO Responses due by 1/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Matthew Morrison, #2 Exhibit A to Morrison Declaration - Dec. Page and Policy, #3 Exhibit 2 - 8-10-22 Letter)(MARJERISON, THOMAS). Added MOTION to Compel Appraisal, MOTION to Stay on 12/29/2022 (slg).
December 21, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Allison Hill White filed by THOMAS S. MARJERISON on behalf of PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2740556.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court and Bar Association Admissions)(MARJERISON, THOMAS)
December 21, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zachary A. McEntyre filed by THOMAS S. MARJERISON on behalf of PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2740554.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court and Bar Association Admissions)(MARJERISON, THOMAS)
December 21, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey S. Cashdan filed by THOMAS S. MARJERISON on behalf of PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2740549.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court and Bar Association Admissions)(MARJERISON, THOMAS)
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James Matthew Brigman filed by THOMAS S. MARJERISON on behalf of PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2740546.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - A - Court and Bar Association Admissions)(MARJERISON, THOMAS)
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julia C. Barrett filed by THOMAS S. MARJERISON on behalf of PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2740535.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court and Bar Association Admissions)(MARJERISON, THOMAS)
December 21, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO. (MARJERISON, THOMAS)
December 21, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorneys ALLISON HILL WHITE and ZACHARY MCENTYRE must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 12/28/2022. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (slg)
December 21, 2022 Set Deadlines: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorneys JULIA C. BARRETT, JEFFREY S. CASHDAN, JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 12/28/2022. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (slg)
December 14, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due by 12/21/2022. (slg)
December 8, 2022 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO. (MARJERISON, THOMAS)
December 7, 2022 Reset Deadlines for PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO per Order #4: Answer due by 12/21/2022 and Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/21/2022. (slg)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer & Submit Corporate Disclosures. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (slg)
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer & Submit Corporate Disclosures by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO Responses due by 12/27/2022. (MARJERISON, THOMAS)
December 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
December 1, 2022 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/7/2022 for Defendants. (jwr)
December 1, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and UNITED CASUALTY INSURANCE CO per FRCivP 81(c): Answer due by 12/7/2022. (jwr)
December 1, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2731437.), filed by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO.(MARJERISON, THOMAS)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO with State Court Pleadings Complaint, Amended Complaint, Summons, Entry of Appearance, Motion to Extend Time to Answer and Proposed Order from Hancock County Superior Court, case number ELLSC-CV-2022-00034. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 2/28/2023) Fee due by 12/2/2022. Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due by 12/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents (Complaint), #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Notice of Appearance, #5 Motion to Extend Time to Answer and Proposed Order, #6 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael D. Silver)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THURSTON v. PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW THURSTON
Represented By: JOHN Z. STEED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS S. MARJERISON
Represented By: ALLISON HILL WHITE
Represented By: JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN
Represented By: JEFFREY S. CASHDAN
Represented By: JULIA C. BARRETT
Represented By: ZACHARY A. MCENTYRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY CO
Represented By: THOMAS S. MARJERISON
Represented By: ZACHARY A. MCENTYRE
Represented By: JEFFREY S. CASHDAN
Represented By: ALLISON HILL WHITE
Represented By: JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN
Represented By: JULIA C. BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?