AROOSTOOK COUNTY FEDERAL SAVINGS & LOAN v. MARRETT et al
Plaintiff: AROOSTOOK COUNTY FEDERAL SAVINGS & LOAN
Defendant: DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT and MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Case Number: 1:2023cv00006
Filed: January 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION for Leave to Amend/Add Joiners Counterclaim filed by AROOSTOOK COUNTY FEDERAL SAVINGS & LOAN. Reply due by 3/9/2023. (DRUARY, J.)
February 17, 2023 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by AROOSTOOK COUNTY FEDERAL SAVINGS & LOAN. (DRUARY, J.)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION granting #12 Motion for Clarification By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
February 14, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Clarification by DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT (tcs) Modified on 2/15/2023 to correct date filed (tcs).
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #10 Motion for Entry of Default. Show Cause Response due by 2/21/2023. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
February 8, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default by DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(tcs)
February 6, 2023 **FILED IN ERROR** Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to DAVID T. MARRETT and SANDY J. MARRETT on 3/6/2023. (tcs) Modified on 2/15/2023 to mark as filed in error per Order at ECF No. 13 (tcs).
February 3, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Amend/Add Joiners Counterclaim (No PDF Attached, See ECF #8 ) by DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT Responses due by 2/27/2023. (tcs)
February 3, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT. Reply due by 2/21/2023. (tcs)
January 24, 2023 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
January 18, 2023 Set Deadlines: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Lauren K. Souza must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 1/25/2023. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 1/25/2023. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (tcs)
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by AROOSTOOK COUNTY FEDERAL SAVINGS & LOAN Responses due by 2/7/2023. (DRUARY, J.)
January 13, 2023 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AROOSTOOK COUNTY FEDERAL SAVINGS & LOAN. (DRUARY, J.)
January 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE: Recently DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at #https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (tcs)
January 6, 2023 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 1/20/2023. By DEPUTY CLERK: Teagan Snyder(tcs)
January 6, 2023 **FILED IN ERROR** Set Answer Deadline for DAVID T. MARRETT and SANDY J. MARRETT: Answers due by 1/27/2023. (tcs) Modified on 2/15/2023 to mark as filed in error per Order at ECF No. 13 (tcs).
January 6, 2023 Set Deadlines as to AROOSTOOK COUNTY FEDERAL SAVINGS & LOAN: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/13/2023. (tcs)
January 5, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (tcs)
January 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from AROOSTOOK COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number CARSC-RE-2022-003. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SANDY J MARRETT, DAVID T MARRETT. (Service of Process Deadline 4/5/2023) (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix A - Dated Copy of Original Complaint, #3 Appendix B - Defendant's Answer and Counterclaim, #4 Appendix C - Plaintiff's Answer, #5 Appendix D - Foreclosure Scheduling Order, #6 Appendix E - Phone Record, #7 Appendix F - Motion to Enlarge Deadlines, #8 Appendix G - Motion Granting Enlargement of Deadlines, #9 Appendix H - Defendant's Brief with Attached Proof, #10 Appendix I - Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Counterclaim, #11 Appendix J - Recusal and Transfer Order, #12 Appendix K - Assignment of Justice Bruce Mallonee, #13 Appendix L - Defendant's Motion to Strike, #14 Appendix M - Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Strike, #15 Appendix N - Notice to Defendant's Concerning 26(g) Conference and Hearing to Amend, #16 Appendix O - Phone Record, #17 Appendix P - Email to Attorneys, #18 Appendix Q - Register of Actions, #19 Cover Letter, #20 Envelope)(tcs) Modified on 1/6/2023 to correct name of removal court (tcs).
January 5, 2023 Filing Fee Received from DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT: Amount Paid: $402.00. Receipt Number: 1706. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: January 5, 2023 (tcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AROOSTOOK COUNTY FEDERAL SAVINGS & LOAN v. MARRETT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AROOSTOOK COUNTY FEDERAL SAVINGS & LOAN
Represented By: RICHARD D. SOLMAN
Represented By: J. WILLIAM DRUARY, JR.
Represented By: LAUREN K. SOUZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID T MARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDY J MARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?