CROSSPOINT CHURCH v. MAKIN et al
Plaintiff: CROSSPOINT CHURCH
Defendant: A PENDER MAKIN, JEFFERSON ASHBY, EDWARD DAVID, JULIE ANN O'BRIEN, MARK WALKER and THOMAS DOUGLAS
Amicus Curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE and AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
Case Number: 1:2023cv00146
Filed: March 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH A. FORSTER on behalf of All Defendants (FORSTER, SARAH)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/2/2023. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/10/2023. Motions due by 10/23/2023. Ready for Trial on 1/2/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (jad)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by JEFFERSON ASHBY, EDWARD DAVID, THOMAS DOUGLAS, A PENDER MAKIN, JULIE ANN O'BRIEN, MARK WALKER.(TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by CROSSPOINT CHURCH re #21 Reply to Response to Motion . Main Document: Exhibit D. (STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CROSSPOINT CHURCH. (STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 BRIEF Amici Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE. (HEIDEN, ZACHARY)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jad)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Mach filed by ZACHARY L. HEIDEN on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Maine (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2792259.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 list of court admissions)(HEIDEN, ZACHARY)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Heather Weaver filed by ZACHARY L. HEIDEN on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Maine (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2792257.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 list of court admissions)(HEIDEN, ZACHARY)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by American Civil Liberties Union of Maine, American Civil Liberties Union Responses due by 5/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief)(HEIDEN, ZACHARY)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Megan Welter re #14 Response to Motion, filed by JEFFERSON ASHBY, EDWARD DAVID, THOMAS DOUGLAS, A PENDER MAKIN, JULIE ANN O'BRIEN, MARK WALKER. (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JEFFERSON ASHBY, EDWARD DAVID, THOMAS DOUGLAS, A PENDER MAKIN, JULIE ANN O'BRIEN, MARK WALKER. Reply due by 5/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 1 (LD 1833), #2 Exhibit - 2 (LD 1688), #3 Exhibit - 3 (Testimony on LD 1688), #4 Exhibit - 4 (Benjamin Deposition))(TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 5/12/2023 and shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary injunction by 4/28/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Answer Deadline for JEFFERSON ASHBY, EDWARD DAVID, THOMAS DOUGLAS, A PENDER MAKIN, JULIE ANN O'BRIEN, MARK WALKER per order #13: Answer due by 5/12/2023. (jad)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction per order #13: Responses due by 4/28/2023. (jad)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to April 28, 2023 to respond to Preliminary Injunction motion, Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to May 12, 2023 ( Responses due by 4/26/2023.) by JEFFERSON ASHBY, EDWARD DAVID, THOMAS DOUGLAS, A PENDER MAKIN, JULIE ANN O'BRIEN, MARK WALKER (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2779683.), filed by CROSSPOINT CHURCH.(STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Courtney A. Jones filed by PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE on behalf of CROSSPOINT CHURCH (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2778389.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Keisha T. Russell filed by PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE on behalf of CROSSPOINT CHURCH (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2778388.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Appendix Addendum- Other Admissions)(STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lea E. Patterson filed by PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE on behalf of CROSSPOINT CHURCH (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2778387.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Appendix Addendum- Other Admissions)(STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David J. Hacker filed by PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE on behalf of CROSSPOINT CHURCH (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2778384.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Appendix Addendum- Other Admissions)(STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey C. Mateer filed by PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE on behalf of CROSSPOINT CHURCH (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2778381.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Appendix Addendum- Other Admissions)(STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tiffany H. Bates filed by PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE on behalf of CROSSPOINT CHURCH (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2778375.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CROSSPOINT CHURCH Responses due by 4/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - BCS Handbook, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - BCS Teacher Contract, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - BCS Staff Contract)(STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JEFFERSON ASHBY, EDWARD DAVID, THOMAS DOUGLAS, A PENDER MAKIN, JULIE ANN O'BRIEN, MARK WALKER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons- Jefferson Ashby, #2 Summons- Edward David, #3 Summons- Julie Ann O'Brien, #4 Summons- Mark Walker, #5 Summons- Thomas Douglas) (jgd)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CROSSPOINT CHURCH. (jgd)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jgd)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEFFERSON ASHBY, EDWARD DAVID, THOMAS DOUGLAS, A PENDER MAKIN, JULIE ANN O'BRIEN, MARK WALKER PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CROSSPOINT CHURCH. (Service of Process Deadline 6/26/2023) Fee due by 3/29/2023. (jgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROSSPOINT CHURCH v. MAKIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CROSSPOINT CHURCH
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: COURTNEY A. JONES
Represented By: DAVID J. HACKER
Represented By: JEFFREY C. MATEER
Represented By: KEISHA T. RUSSELL
Represented By: LEA PATTERSON
Represented By: TIFFANY H. BATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A PENDER MAKIN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB
Represented By: SARAH A. FORSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON ASHBY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB
Represented By: SARAH A. FORSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD DAVID
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB
Represented By: SARAH A. FORSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE ANN O'BRIEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB
Represented By: SARAH A. FORSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK WALKER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB
Represented By: SARAH A. FORSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS DOUGLAS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB
Represented By: SARAH A. FORSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE
Represented By: HEATHER L. WEAVER
Represented By: ZACHARY L. HEIDEN
Represented By: ANAHITA SOTOOHI
Represented By: CAROL GARVAN
Represented By: DANIEL MACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
Represented By: ANAHITA SOTOOHI
Represented By: DANIEL MACH
Represented By: CAROL GARVAN
Represented By: HEATHER L. WEAVER
Represented By: ZACHARY L. HEIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?